This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/12/2020 at 04:51:34 (UTC).

JAMES RYU VS JP MORGAN CHASE BANK NA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/17/2020 JAMES RYU filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against JP MORGAN CHASE BANK NA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DEIRDRE HILL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6920

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DEIRDRE HILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RYU JAMES AKA HUKI RYU

Defendants

MATKEN CHELLEIE

PENNYMAC INVESTMENT HOLDING 1 LLC A DELAWARE CORPORATION

MIRMAN BUBMAN NAHMIAS LLP

SLY JEANETTE

CHRISTINA ALEGRIA AND HER FAMILY TRUST

MTC CORPORATION

ALAGRIA ERIC

PENNYMAC CORPORATION

BUBMAN MICHAEL E

LEMUSI AMY

JP MORGAN CHASE BANK NA

QUALITY LOAN SERVICES CORP

PENNYMAC MORTGAGE INVESTMENT TRUST HOLDINGS 1 LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

BUBMAN MICHAEL E.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/17/2020: Complaint

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

7/17/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/17/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/17/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/17/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/21/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Related Case

8/17/2020: Notice of Related Case

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

10/23/2020: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THIS ...)

10/23/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THIS ...)

Order - Dismissal

10/23/2020: Order - Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: SETTING OF OSC RE: DISMISSAL) OF 10/14/2020

10/14/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: SETTING OF OSC RE: DISMISSAL) OF 10/14/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: SETTING OF OSC RE: DISMISSAL)

10/14/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: SETTING OF OSC RE: DISMISSAL)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (why this case should not be dismissed for failure of the plaintiff to obtain a pre-filing order) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: why this ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • Docketat 09:52 AM in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: setting of OSC re: dismissal) of 10/14/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: setting of OSC re: dismissal)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Pennymac Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by James Ryu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by James Ryu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MTC is a litigant

Latest cases where PENNYMAC MORTGAGE INVESTMENT TRUST HOLDINGS I LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PENNYMAC CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant