This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/25/2020 at 01:43:37 (UTC).

JAMES RYU VS JP MORGAN CHASE BANK NA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/10/2020 JAMES RYU filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against JP MORGAN CHASE BANK NA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DEIRDRE HILL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6615

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DEIRDRE HILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RYU JAMES HUKI RYU

Defendants

MIRMAN BUDMAN NAHMIAS LLP

MATKEN CHELLEIE

PENNYMAC HOLDING LLC

MTC CORPORATION

BUBMAN MICHAEL E

ALAGRIA ERIC

QUALITY LOAN SERVICES CORP.

ALEGRIA CHRISTINA

LEMUSI AMY

JP MORGAN CHASE BANK NA

PENNYMAC MORTGAGE INVESTMENT TRUST HOLDINGS 1 LLC

SLY JENETTIE

PENNYMAC CORP.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/10/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

7/10/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/16/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

7/16/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Complaint

7/10/2020: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/10/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

8/7/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/07/2020

8/7/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/07/2020

Notice of Related Case

7/24/2020: Notice of Related Case

Order - Dismissal

10/23/2020: Order - Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL...)

10/23/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL...)

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

10/23/2020: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL...) OF 10/23/2020

10/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL...) OF 10/23/2020

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (for failure to post security) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal...) of 10/23/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • Docketat 2:13 PM in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 08/07/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by PennyMac Holding LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by James Ryu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by James Ryu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MTC is a litigant

Latest cases where PENNYMAC MORTGAGE INVESTMENT TRUST HOLDINGS I LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PENNYMAC CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where PennyMac Holdings LLC is a litigant