This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/29/2021 at 07:26:55 (UTC).

JAMES RUTHERFORD VS LEE & NORWALK INVESTORS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/04/2021 JAMES RUTHERFORD filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against LEE NORWALK INVESTORS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0353

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RUTHERFORD JAMES

Defendant

LEE & NORWALK INVESTORS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANNING JR JOSEPH RICHARD

Defendant Attorney

LEWIS JOHN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/4/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/4/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/4/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/4/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/4/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

6/23/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER SETTING CASE FOR HEARING/STAYING CASE PURSUANT TO...)

7/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER SETTING CASE FOR HEARING/STAYING CASE PURSUANT TO...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER SETTING CASE FOR HEARING/STAYING CASE PURSUANT TO...) OF 07/26/2021, NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS AND EARLY EVALUATION CONFERENCE

7/26/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER SETTING CASE FOR HEARING/STAYING CASE PURSUANT TO...) OF 07/26/2021, NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS AND EARLY EVALUATION CONFERENCE

Notice of Stay of Proceedings and Early Evaluation Conference (Construction-Related Accessibility C - NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS AND EARLY EVALUATION CONFERENCE (CONSTRUCTION-RELATED ACCESSIBILITY

7/19/2021: Notice of Stay of Proceedings and Early Evaluation Conference (Construction-Related Accessibility C - NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS AND EARLY EVALUATION CONFERENCE (CONSTRUCTION-RELATED ACCESSIBILITY

Defendant's Application for Stay and Early Evaluation Conference Pursuant to Civil Code Section 55 - DEFENDANT'S APPLICATION FOR STAY AND EARLY EVALUATION CONFERENCE PURSUANT TO CIVIL CODE SECTION 55.

7/19/2021: Defendant's Application for Stay and Early Evaluation Conference Pursuant to Civil Code Section 55 - DEFENDANT'S APPLICATION FOR STAY AND EARLY EVALUATION CONFERENCE PURSUANT TO CIVIL CODE SECTION 55.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2021
  • Hearing11/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Early Evaluation Conference (Construction Related Accessibility Claim)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • Docketat 3:19 PM in Department F; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Setting Case for Hearing/Staying Case Pursuant to...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Setting Case for Hearing/Staying Case Pursuant to...) of 07/26/2021, Notice of Stay of Proceedings and Early Evaluation Conference and Defendant's Application Pursuant to Civil Code Section 55.54 for Stay and Early Evaluation Conference); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Stay of Proceedings and Early Evaluation Conference (Construction-Related Accessibility Claim); Filed by LEE & NORWALK INVESTORS, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketDefendant's Application for Stay and Early Evaluation Conference Pursuant to Civil Code Section 55.54; Filed by LEE & NORWALK INVESTORS, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by James Rutherford (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by James Rutherford (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by James Rutherford (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by James Rutherford (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Manning, Jr, Joseph R