This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/17/2023 at 20:48:55 (UTC).

JAMES REICH VS REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/07/2021 JAMES REICH filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1248

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REICH JAMES

Defendants

CHIN ARNOLD I MD

CLARK UROLOGY

REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WEISS JERRIE S

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/7/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/7/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/7/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/7/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

6/18/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/18/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

11/21/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 11/21/2022

11/21/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 11/21/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL; FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

12/5/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL; FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-JURY TRIAL; FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 12/05/2022

12/5/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-JURY TRIAL; FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 12/05/2022

Order - Dismissal

12/5/2022: Order - Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by James Reich on 06/07/2021, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action, pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure Section 581(b)(3)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial; Final Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial; Final Status Conference) of 12/05/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 updated: Result Date to 12/05/2022; Result Type to Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 12/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 updated: Result Date to 12/05/2022; Result Type to Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 06/03/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/05/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 12/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Final Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Final Status Conference) of 11/21/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 11/21/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 06/03/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 29 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: James Reich (Plaintiff); As to: Regents of the University of California (Defendant); Arnold I Chin, MD (Defendant); Clark Urology (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: James Reich (Plaintiff); As to: Regents of the University of California (Defendant); Arnold I Chin, MD (Defendant); Clark Urology (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: James Reich (Plaintiff); As to: Regents of the University of California (Defendant); Arnold I Chin, MD (Defendant); Clark Urology (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less