Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/02/2020 at 04:09:06 (UTC).

JAMES R. CLAUSEN VS ORO ENGINEERING CORP., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/13/2018 JAMES R CLAUSEN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ORO ENGINEERING CORP . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HUEY P. COTTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0304

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HUEY P. COTTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

CLAUSEN JAMES R. AKA JIMMY CLAUSEN

MOES 1 THROUGH 50

CLAUSEN JAMES R.

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

POOL ENGINEERING INC.

KILEDJIAN GEORGE

GILES JORGE LUIS GILES POOL AND SPA MAINTENANCE

B & B ASSOICIATES INC.

ORO ENGINEERING CORP.

SALAS & SONS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

THE REBAR MAN INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

PRECISION GUNITE CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

INSPIRATION POOL PLASTERING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SHUBECK ROBERT JAMES

GILES JORGE LUIS

GILES JORGE LUIS DBA GILES POOL AND SPA MAINTENANCE

OROZCO RAUL BARBOSA DBA TRUST BUILDERS CONSTRUCTION

CLAUSEN JAMES R. AKA JIMMY CLAUSEN

MOES 1 THROUGH 50

GILES POOL AND SPA MAINTENANCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DICKER DAVID HUNT

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

SHUBECK CHRISTOPHER

MILLER KATHLEEN C

DIAZ RENEE S

O'BRIEN PATRICK

KAIMAN BARRY G.

MARKS GREGORY W.

 

Court Documents

Answer

7/17/2019: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/10/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

4/26/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Case Management Statement

4/18/2019: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/18/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Deposit - Jury

4/8/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

Request for Dismissal

3/26/2019: Request for Dismissal

Case Management Statement

4/2/2019: Case Management Statement

Cross-Complaint

4/3/2019: Cross-Complaint

Case Management Statement

4/3/2019: Case Management Statement

Answer

3/13/2019: Answer

Notice of Deposit - Jury

3/15/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

Certificate - CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

3/11/2019: Certificate - CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

Proof of Service by Mail

3/11/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

2/8/2019: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Proof of Service by Mail

1/31/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Certificate - Certificate Certificate of Merit

1/23/2019: Certificate - Certificate Certificate of Merit

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/13/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

55 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2020
  • Hearing10/05/2020 at 09:00 AM in Department A at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • Hearing09/25/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Salas & Sons Excavating Erroneously Sued As Salas & Sons, Inc., a California Corporation (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • Docketat 3:53 PM in Department A, Huey P. Cotton, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Stipulation and Order to Set Aside Default) of 10/17/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: Stipulation and Order to Set Aside Default)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (To Set Aside Default); Filed by Salas & Sons Excavating Erroneously Sued As Salas & Sons, Inc., a California Corporation (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (JOINT STIPULATION AND PROPOSED DISCOVERY ORDER); Filed by James R. Clausen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by James R. Clausen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, Huey P. Cotton, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketCertificate (Certificate of Merit); Filed by James R. Clausen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by James R. Clausen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service (of Summons); Filed by James R. Clausen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by James R. Clausen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by James R. Clausen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by James R. Clausen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by James R. Clausen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ORO ENGINEERING CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Precision Gunite Corp is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DICKER, DAVID H