This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/11/2020 at 02:27:22 (UTC).

JAMES NARDINI, ET AL. VS STEVE JOANOU

Case Summary

On 04/07/2020 JAMES NARDINI filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against STEVE JOANOU. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM D. STEWART. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0266

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Burbank Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM D. STEWART

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NARDINI DEDE

NARDINI JAMES

Defendants

STEVE JOANOU DBA REMODEL KING BIZ

JOANOU STEVE DBA REMODEL KING BIZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BURNS ELKANAH JOHNSOM

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

9/16/2020: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF REJECTION DEFAULT/CLERK'S JUDGMENT]

9/16/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF REJECTION DEFAULT/CLERK'S JUDGMENT]

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/16/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/18/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

9/11/2020: Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/11/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

9/11/2020: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Proof of Service by Mail

9/4/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

9/8/2020: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF REJECTION DEFAULT/CLERK'S JUDGMENT]

9/8/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF REJECTION DEFAULT/CLERK'S JUDGMENT]

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTIN...) OF 08/11/2020

8/11/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTIN...) OF 08/11/2020

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/20/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

4/17/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/7/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/7/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/7/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

4/7/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Complaint

4/7/2020: Complaint

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2020
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Submission of Default Judgment package) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • Docketat 11:31 AM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by James Nardini (Plaintiff); Dede Nardini (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by James Nardini (Plaintiff); Dede Nardini (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by James Nardini (Plaintiff); Dede Nardini (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by James Nardini (Plaintiff); Dede Nardini (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by James Nardini (Plaintiff); Dede Nardini (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by James Nardini (Plaintiff); Dede Nardini (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • Docketat 2:09 PM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by James Nardini (Plaintiff); Dede Nardini (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by James Nardini (Plaintiff); Dede Nardini (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by James Nardini (Plaintiff); Dede Nardini (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by James Nardini (Plaintiff); Dede Nardini (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less