This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/27/2019 at 02:55:30 (UTC).

JAMES MITCHELL VS LOS ANGELES COUNTY SHERIFF

Case Summary

On 11/26/2018 JAMES MITCHELL filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against LOS ANGELES COUNTY SHERIFF. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2939

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MITCHELL JAMES

Los Angeles, CA 90061

Respondents

LOS ANGELES COUNTY SHERIFF

U.S. BANK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

ZEFF MICHAEL DAVID

Attorney at Law Offices of Michael D. Zeff

16255 Ventura Blvd Ste 1016

Encino, CA 91436

NELSON HENRY PATRICK

 

Court Documents

Request for Refund / Order

6/19/2019: Request for Refund / Order

Notice

5/9/2019: Notice

Minute Order

6/6/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

6/6/2019: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order

4/8/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

4/9/2019: Notice of Ruling

Order - Dismissal

5/8/2019: Order - Dismissal

Minute Order

5/8/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

2/13/2019: Minute Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/18/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Case Management Statement

3/28/2019: Case Management Statement

Summons

11/26/2018: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/26/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Ex Parte Application

11/27/2018: Ex Parte Application

Notice

12/10/2018: Notice

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/12/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

12/12/2018: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Answer

12/18/2018: Answer

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketRequest for Refund / Order; Filed by Los Angeles County Sheriff (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Order to Show Cause Re: (sanctions, including dismissal, for plaintiff's failure to appear on 5/8/2019 and 4/8/2019 and failure to comply with CRC 3.720 et. seq.) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Los Angeles County Sheriff (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: sanctions...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Ruling and Notice of Order To Show Cause Hearing); Filed by Los Angeles County Sheriff (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Order to Show Cause Re: (dismissal for failure to file proof of service as to U.S. Bank) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: dismissal...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 11/27/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 82; Ex-Parte Proceedings

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • DocketEx Parte Application (for Alternative Writ of Mandate); Filed by James Mitchell (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PETITIONER, JAMES MITCHELL, FOR ALTER...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • DocketNotice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketPetition for Writ of Mandate; Filed by James Mitchell (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by James Mitchell (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketPetition for Writ of Mandate; Filed by James Mitchell (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Petition for Writ of Mandate)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Bank National Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NELSON HENRY PATRICK ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZEFF MICHAEL D.