This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/26/2019 at 04:46:23 (UTC).

JAMES MILLER VS 24 HOUR FITNESS UNITED STATES INC

Case Summary

On 06/26/2017 JAMES MILLER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against 24 HOUR FITNESS UNITED STATES INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6461

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MILLER JAMES

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 30

24 HOUR FITNESS UNITED STATES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF VAHDAT & ASSOCIATE

VAHDAT & ABOUDI A.P.C.

Defendant Attorney

NICK JACK CLIFFORD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Continuance of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication by 24 Hour Fitness USA, Inc.; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declarations of Wayne W. Watten and Ted Wilson); Filed by 24 Hour Fitness United States, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketExhibit List; Filed by 24 Hour Fitness United States, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Wayne Watten in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment); Filed by 24 Hour Fitness United States, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Ted Wilson in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment); Filed by 24 Hour Fitness United States, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketSeparate Statement; Filed by 24 Hour Fitness United States, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment; Filed by 24 Hour Fitness United States, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
85 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • DocketOrder-Protective; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • DocketAMENDED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by 24 Hour Fitness United States, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • DocketANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by James Miller (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by James Miller (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (1) PREMISES LIABILITY; AND (2) NEGLIGENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****6461    Hearing Date: December 09, 2020    Dept: 32

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 32

james miller,

Plaintiff,

v.

24 hour fitness united states inc.,

Defendant.

Case No.: ****6461

Hearing Date: December 9, 2020

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

motion to be relieved as counsel

Vadat and Aboudi, A.P.L.C. (“Counsel”) moves to be relieved as counsel for Plaintiff James Miller (“Plaintiff”). Counsel has filed forms MC-051 and MC-052 as required, and has lodged with the Court a copy of the proposed order on form MC-053 as required. (Cal Rules of Court, rule 3.1362.) The basis for this motion is a breakdown in the attorney-client relationship. This constitutes good cause.

Based upon the foregoing, Counsel’s motion is granted. The Court provides notice to all parties that the case is stayed, pending resolution of Defendant’s bankruptcy petition, and the Court shall hold a status conference on the bankruptcy on April 14, 2021, at 8:30 a.m.

The Court orders Plaintiff’s counsel to serve a copy of this order, as well as a copy of the Court’s order on Form MC-053, upon all parties including Plaintiff within ten (10) days. The Court orders Plaintiff’s counsel to file proof of service within twenty (20) days. Counsel shall remain counsel-of-record until BOTH of the Court’s orders are served and he files proof of service with the Court. Counsel shall provide notice.

DATED: December 9, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 24 HOUR FITNESS UNITED STATES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NICK JACK