This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/23/2021 at 00:24:42 (UTC).

JAMES KUBINIEC VS IKEA US RETAIL LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/09/2020 JAMES KUBINIEC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against IKEA US RETAIL LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7169

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KUBINIEC JAMES

Defendants

IKEA NORTH AMERICA SERVICES LLC

IKEA PROPERTY INC.

IKEA DISTRIBUTION SERVICES INC.

IKEA US RETAIL LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STOLL MATTHEW C.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/9/2020: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/9/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/9/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/9/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/9/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

12/16/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/16/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/16/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/16/2020: Proof of Personal Service

PI General Order

1/14/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

1/14/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

Request for Dismissal

2/9/2021: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by JAMES KUBINIEC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by JAMES KUBINIEC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by JAMES KUBINIEC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by JAMES KUBINIEC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by JAMES KUBINIEC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JAMES KUBINIEC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JAMES KUBINIEC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by JAMES KUBINIEC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JAMES KUBINIEC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less