This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/22/2021 at 10:43:15 (UTC).

JAMES KALDAWI VS CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 07/27/2021 JAMES KALDAWI filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0970

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KALDAWI JAMES

Defendant

CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SZABO LAWRENCE JAY

Defendant Attorney

HEMPHILL LORA

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/29/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/27/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/27/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

7/27/2021: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

8/12/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/30/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ERRATA TO DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY'S VERIFIED ANSWER; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL OF SEPTEMBER 24, 2021

9/28/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ERRATA TO DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY'S VERIFIED ANSWER; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL OF SEPTEMBER 24, 2021

Answer

9/24/2021: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2021
  • Hearing11/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department W at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by James Kaldawi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF ERRATA TO DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY'S VERIFIED ANSWER; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL OF SEPTEMBER 24, 2021); Filed by California Automobile Insurance Company, a corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by California Automobile Insurance Company, a corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by James Kaldawi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by James Kaldawi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by James Kaldawi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by James Kaldawi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SZABO LAWRENCE J.