This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/10/2019 at 00:30:22 (UTC).

JAMES J ARMSTRONG ET AL VS WALTON LAW GROUP PC

Case Summary

On 04/25/2017 JAMES J ARMSTRONG filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against WALTON LAW GROUP PC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RITA MILLER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8816

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RITA MILLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

ARMSTRONG & ARMSTRONG

ARMSTRONG JAMES J.

Defendants and Respondents

WALTON LAW GROUP P.C.

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

WALTON JOHN R.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BAKER KEENER & NAHRA LLP

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

WALTON JOHN R. ESQ.

AFFELD DAVID W. ESQ.

AFFELD DAVID W.

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

1/8/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

NOTICE OF RULING ON DEMURRER AND MOTIONS TO STRIKE OF THE DEFENDANTS; AND THE EX PARTE APPLICATIONS BY PLAINTIFFS & DEFENDANTS

2/8/2018: NOTICE OF RULING ON DEMURRER AND MOTIONS TO STRIKE OF THE DEFENDANTS; AND THE EX PARTE APPLICATIONS BY PLAINTIFFS & DEFENDANTS

SUPPLEMENTAL CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

2/8/2018: SUPPLEMENTAL CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

SUMMONS ON SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

2/20/2018: SUMMONS ON SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT - EXHIBITS INCORPORATED, REFERENCED & ATTACHED, THERETO & THEREWITH

2/20/2018: 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT - EXHIBITS INCORPORATED, REFERENCED & ATTACHED, THERETO & THEREWITH

2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF; FOR EQUITABLE AND INJUNCTIVE REMEDIES; AND FOR DAMAGES (VERIFIED); 1. DECLARATORY RELIEF; 2. EQUITABLE/INJUNCTIVE REMEDIES; ETC.

2/20/2018: 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF; FOR EQUITABLE AND INJUNCTIVE REMEDIES; AND FOR DAMAGES (VERIFIED); 1. DECLARATORY RELIEF; 2. EQUITABLE/INJUNCTIVE REMEDIES; ETC.

Minute Order

2/21/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

2/22/2018: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

2/22/2018: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF RULING BY THE COURT OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON FEBRUARY 21, 2018

3/1/2018: NOTICE OF RULING BY THE COURT OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON FEBRUARY 21, 2018

DEFENDANT WALTON LAW GROUP'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURHTER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE); DECLARATION OF DAMION ROBINSON

3/5/2018: DEFENDANT WALTON LAW GROUP'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURHTER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE); DECLARATION OF DAMION ROBINSON

NOTICE OF RULING ON EX PARTE APPLICATIONS

3/6/2018: NOTICE OF RULING ON EX PARTE APPLICATIONS

EX PARTE APPLICATION BY PLAINTIFFS TO CHANGE & CONTINUE HEARING DATES OF TWO (2) OF FOUR (4) DISCOVERY MOTIONS OF DEFENDANTS DUE TO THE ILLNESS OF PLAINTIFFS? COUNSEL; A DECLARATION OF JAMES J. ARMSTR

3/6/2018: EX PARTE APPLICATION BY PLAINTIFFS TO CHANGE & CONTINUE HEARING DATES OF TWO (2) OF FOUR (4) DISCOVERY MOTIONS OF DEFENDANTS DUE TO THE ILLNESS OF PLAINTIFFS? COUNSEL; A DECLARATION OF JAMES J. ARMSTR

OPPOSITION BY PLAINTIFFS TO EX PARTE APPLICATION OF THE DEFENDANTS TO SHORTEN TIME TO FILE A MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFFS ORDERED BY THE COURT ON JANUARY 25, 2018; DECLARAT

3/6/2018: OPPOSITION BY PLAINTIFFS TO EX PARTE APPLICATION OF THE DEFENDANTS TO SHORTEN TIME TO FILE A MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFFS ORDERED BY THE COURT ON JANUARY 25, 2018; DECLARAT

DEFENDANTS? RESPONSE TO EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE HEARINGS ON MOTIONS TO COMPEL; DECLARATION OF DAMION ROBINSON

3/6/2018: DEFENDANTS? RESPONSE TO EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE HEARINGS ON MOTIONS TO COMPEL; DECLARATION OF DAMION ROBINSON

NOTICE OF APPLICATION & EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STRIKE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND TO DISMISS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF DAMION ROBINSON

3/6/2018: NOTICE OF APPLICATION & EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STRIKE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND TO DISMISS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF DAMION ROBINSON

Minute Order

3/6/2018: Minute Order

MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION BY PLAINTIFFS PURSUANT TO SECTION 1008 C.C.P. TO THE RULING AND THE MINUTE ORDER DATED MARCH 6, 2018, ON EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANTS, ETC

3/21/2018: MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION BY PLAINTIFFS PURSUANT TO SECTION 1008 C.C.P. TO THE RULING AND THE MINUTE ORDER DATED MARCH 6, 2018, ON EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANTS, ETC

80 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2018
  • Docketat 09:01 AM in Department 16; Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • DocketCourt's ORDER on Motion for Reconsideration; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • DocketResponse (by the Plaintiffs to an Untimely, Belated and Misleading "Objection" by Defendants to the Reply by Plaintiffs to Opposition by Defendants of a Motion for Reconsideration (Section 1008 CCP) Request for Judicial Notice Declaration James Armstrong Points an); Filed by Armstrong & Armstrong (Plaintiff); James J. Armstrong (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • DocketDefendant's Objection to Improper Reply Argument and Evidence; Filed by Walton Law Group, P.C. (Defendant); John R. Walton (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • DocketReply (to Opposition to the Motion for Reconsideration, ETC., Pursuant 1008 C.C.P., By Plaintiffs on Order of March 6, 2018, on Ex Parte Application of Defendants); Filed by Armstrong & Armstrong (Plaintiff); James J. Armstrong (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketOpposition (To Motion for Reconsideration); Filed by Walton Law Group, P.C. (Defendant); John R. Walton (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 16; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • Docketat 09:02 AM in Department 16; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 16; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
163 More Docket Entries
  • 06/06/2017
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • Docket1) DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF HEARING RE DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT'S NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE & OSC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Armstrong & Armstrong (Plaintiff); James J. Armstrong (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARMSTRONG & ARMSTRONG is a litigant

Latest cases where WALTON LAW GROUP P.C. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WALTON JOHN R. ESQ.