This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/27/2022 at 05:10:52 (UTC).

JAMES HANNON VS TORRANCE MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/17/2021 JAMES HANNON filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against TORRANCE MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0354

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HANNON JAMES

Defendants

ANDRAWIS JOHN P. MD

TORRANCE MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARTON ANDREW J.

Defendant Attorney

WERRE GREGORY D.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/17/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/17/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/17/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/17/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/17/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Demand for Jury Trial

10/8/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/8/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

10/8/2021: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/7/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/7/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

PI General Order

9/14/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

9/14/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2024
  • Hearing08/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • Hearing02/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • Hearing01/31/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Torrance Memorial Medical Center (Defendant); John P. Andrawis, MD (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Torrance Memorial Medical Center (Defendant); John P. Andrawis, MD (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Torrance Memorial Medical Center (Defendant); John P. Andrawis, MD (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by James Hannon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by James Hannon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by James Hannon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by James Hannon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by James Hannon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by James Hannon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TORRANCE MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARTON ANDREW J.