This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/14/2022 at 04:34:18 (UTC).

JAMES GADSDEN VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/14/2020 JAMES GADSDEN filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0954

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GADSDEN JAMES

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Cross Defendant

ROES 1 THROUGH 50 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHIRVANIAN NARBEH

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

WILCOX WENDY LEIGH

STOCKALPER PATRICK E.

WILLIAMS ELIZABETH E

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)) OF 05/18/2022

5/18/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)) OF 05/18/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

5/18/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Request for Dismissal

5/4/2022: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/27/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/27/2022

4/27/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/27/2022

Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

8/25/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

10/21/2021: Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

Notice of Settlement

1/27/2022: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

1/28/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/21/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Cross-Complaint

10/21/2020: Cross-Complaint

Answer

10/21/2020: Answer

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

10/13/2020: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal

10/9/2020: Request for Dismissal

Declaration - DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY

10/2/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY

Answer

10/2/2020: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

10/2/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Proof of Personal Service

9/22/2020: Proof of Personal Service

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2022
  • Hearing08/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)) of 05/18/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by JAMES GADSDEN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • Docketat 4:00 PM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/27/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Trial Attorney); Filed by COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by JAMES GADSDEN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by JAMES GADSDEN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JAMES GADSDEN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by JAMES GADSDEN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JAMES GADSDEN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILLIAMS ELIZABETH E

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILCOX WENDY L. ESQ.