This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/19/2021 at 10:36:01 (UTC).

JAMES EDWARD HOLMES VS MICHELLE ANN MONDRAGON, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/23/2021 JAMES EDWARD HOLMES filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MICHELLE ANN MONDRAGON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5340

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOLMES JAMES EDWARD

Defendants

MONDRAGON LUIS

MONDRAGON MICHELLE ANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BAUMAN SHAUN JOSEPH

BECK MITCHELL

Defendant Attorney

MAHLSTEDT JOY L.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/23/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/23/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/23/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/23/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

5/4/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

5/4/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Demand for Jury Trial

7/27/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

7/27/2021: Answer

Substitution of Attorney

9/23/2021: Substitution of Attorney

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2024
  • Hearing04/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • Hearing10/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • Hearing10/07/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by James Edward Holmes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Michelle Ann Mondragon (Defendant); Luis Mondragon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Michelle Ann Mondragon (Defendant); Luis Mondragon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by James Edward Holmes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by James Edward Holmes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by James Edward Holmes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAHLSTEDT JOY