This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/29/2020 at 09:03:58 (UTC).

JAMES EDWARD BETTIS VS CATHY ANNE KESLER ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/13/2018 JAMES EDWARD BETTIS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CATHY ANNE KESLER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE and MARK A. BORENSTEIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9907

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

BETTIS JAMES EDWARD

Defendants and Respondents

GOLT LISA

KESLER CATHY ANNE

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

LIPSTICK BAIL BONDS INCORPORATED

LIPSTICK BAIL BONDS INCORPORATED DOE 1

Not Classified By Court

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

YAGOUBZADEH JOSHUA ESQ.

YAGHOUBZADEH JOSHUA E. ESQ.

Defendant and Not Classified By Court Attorneys

SULLIVAN DANIEL J.

SULLIVAN DANIEL J. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Request for Refund / Order

10/18/2019: Request for Refund / Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 07/01/2020

7/1/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 07/01/2020

Notice of Settlement - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (CONDITIONAL)

7/1/2020: Notice of Settlement - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (CONDITIONAL)

Complaint in Intervention

2/24/2020: Complaint in Intervention

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19;)

4/20/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19;) OF 04/20/2020

4/20/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19;) OF 04/20/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE FILED BY PROPOSED IN...)

12/17/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE FILED BY PROPOSED IN...)

Answer

11/5/2019: Answer

Request for Judicial Notice

11/13/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR SAID MOTION

10/17/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR SAID MOTION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL REL...)

10/17/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL REL...)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/19/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

7/10/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

3/27/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

6/13/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

6/13/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

6/13/2018: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

SUMMONS -

6/13/2018: SUMMONS -

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2021
  • Hearing02/19/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement) of 07/01/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement ((Conditional)); Filed by James Edward Bettis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: COVID-19;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by James Edward Bettis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by James Edward Bettis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by James Edward Bettis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by James Edward Bettis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by James Edward Bettis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC709907    Hearing Date: December 17, 2019    Dept: 2

Bettis v. Kesler et al.

Motion by State Farm Mutual Insurance Company for Leave to Intervene is GRANTED.

Intervention is proper where the Intervenor shows an interest relating to the property or transaction which is the subject of the action and disposition of the action may as a practical matter impair or impede that person’s ability to protect the interest. Cal Code Civil Procedure § 387(b).

State Farm Mutual Insurance Company has an interest in this litigation in that it is the insurance carrier for Defendant, who cannot defend itself while it is suspended. Declaration of Daniel Sullivan, ¶ 5 – 6. Reed v. Norman (1957) 48 Cal.2d 338, 343. Intervention is permitted to allow the insurer to protect its interests in the litigation. Western Heritage Ins. Co. v. Superior Court (2011) 199 Cal. App. 4th 1196, 1207-1208; Reliance Ins. Co. v. Superior Court (2000) 84 Cal. App. 4th 383, 385; Kaufman & Broad Communities, Inc. v. Performance Plastering, Inc. (2006) 136 Cal.App.4th 212, 222.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.