This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/06/2022 at 21:40:19 (UTC).

JAMES DALE KIRBY, ET AL. VS EDISON INTERNATIONAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 JAMES DALE KIRBY filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against EDISON INTERNATIONAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1870

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ARCHDALE DONALD GILBERT

BAILEY WENDY SUE

BAKER LOGAN

BORDEN DAVID JOHN

BRYANT CAROLYN ANN

BRYANT HAROLD RICKY

CAGIGAS CONSTANTINO JOHN

CARLE IRMA ANN

CHA SUNG OK

CHAMBERLAIN ELIZABETH

CHAMBERLAIN PERRY

CHOI JOSEPH HYONGKWAN

FAGAN ANNA

FARLEY JOHN THOMAS

FARLEY VIRGINIA

FERNANDEZ ALICIA G

FERNANDEZ ANGEL

FERNANDEZ EFREN

FERNANDEZ FRANCISCO EFREN

Defendant

EDISON INTERNATIONAL

75 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOXER DOUGLAS

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/18/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

1/18/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/18/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

1/18/2022: Complaint

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/18/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION) OF 02/09/2022

2/9/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION) OF 02/09/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION)

2/9/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/7/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2022
  • Docketat 3:30 PM in Department 11, David S. Cunningham, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Complex Determination)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Complex Determination) of 02/09/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by James Dale Kirby (Plaintiff); Roberta Jean Kirby (Plaintiff); The Kirby Family Trust (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by James Dale Kirby (Plaintiff); Roberta Jean Kirby (Plaintiff); The Kirby Family Trust (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by James Dale Kirby (Plaintiff); Roberta Jean Kirby (Plaintiff); The Kirby Family Trust (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EDISON INTERNATIONAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOXER DOUGLAS