Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/02/2021 at 21:00:59 (UTC).

JAMES CHUNG VS FCA US LLC

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 JAMES CHUNG filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FCA US LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0508

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHUNG JAMES

Defendant

FCA US LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BASOLA JENNIFER

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

4/15/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/15/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/14/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/14/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/14/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/14/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2021
  • Hearing09/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department D at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • Hearing06/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department D at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by James Chung (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by James Chung (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by James Chung (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FCA US LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BASOLA JENNIFER