This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/29/2019 at 12:12:19 (UTC).

JAMES BOLTON VS XYZ RENT 14 LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/19/2018 a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury case was filed by JAMES BOLTON against XYZ RENT 14 LLC in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2476

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

BOLTON JAMES

Defendants and Respondents

NEGARL DANIEL

THEGREAT STATE LLC

XYZ RENT 14 LLC

DOES 1 TO 10

THE GREAT STATE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

OLIVO EDUARDO ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

ROBERT J. LYNCH

LYNCH ROBERT J.

SLATER MATTHEW ALLEN

LYNCH ROBERT JAMES

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE

11/26/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE)

11/18/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE) OF 11/18/2019

11/18/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE) OF 11/18/2019

Separate Statement

11/4/2019: Separate Statement

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO QUESTIONS AT DEPOSITION; DECLARATION OF MATTHEW SLATER

11/4/2019: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO QUESTIONS AT DEPOSITION; DECLARATION OF MATTHEW SLATER

Proof of Service by Mail

11/4/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES

8/29/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES

Answer - from Daniel Negari

7/13/2018: Answer - from Daniel Negari

Answer - THE GREAT STATE LLC

7/30/2018: Answer - THE GREAT STATE LLC

Answer -

6/15/2018: Answer -

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt -

5/24/2018: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt -

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) -

5/11/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) -

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) -

5/11/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) -

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) -

5/11/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) -

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

4/19/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

PLAINTIFF JAMES BOLTONS NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEE DEPOSIT

4/19/2018: PLAINTIFF JAMES BOLTONS NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEE DEPOSIT

SUMMONS -

4/19/2018: SUMMONS -

PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR: 1. DISCRIMINATION; ETC

4/19/2018: PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR: 1. DISCRIMINATION; ETC

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2021
  • Hearing04/19/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 3 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; : OSC RE Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • Hearing03/23/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 3 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • Hearing03/11/2020 at 10:00 AM in Department 3 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • Hearing01/10/2020 at 13:30 PM in Department 3 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Further Responses to Questions at Deposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • Hearing01/07/2020 at 10:30 AM in Department 3 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Continuance of Informal Discovery Conference); Filed by XYZ Rent 14 LLC (Defendant); The Great State LLC (Defendant); Daniel Negarl (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • Docketat 2:22 PM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Continuance of Informal Discovery Conference) of 11/18/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: Continuance of Informal Discovery Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketSeparate Statement; Filed by XYZ Rent 14 LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by James Bolton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by James Bolton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by James Bolton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by James Bolton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by James Bolton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketPLAINTIFF JAMES BOLTONS NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEE DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR: 1. DISCRIMINATION; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC702476    Hearing Date: January 21, 2020    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

JAMES BOLTON,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

XYZ RENT 14, LLC, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

Case No.: BC702476

[TENTATIVE] ORDER TAKING HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPELOFF CALENDAR

Dept. 3

10:00 a.m.

January 21, 2020

On 1/10/20, the Court issued an order continuing the hearing on this motion to 1/21/20 in light of the parties’ scheduled IDC on 1/07/20. The parties took the 1/07/20 IDC off calendar and did not appear at the hearing. The parties have not, to date, taken the MTCF off calendar. The Court presumes the MTCF is moot because the parties did not appear at the IDC. The Court asks Counsel to ensure motions are promptly taken off calendar upon resolution in the future in connection with this and other actions; prompt removal of moot issues from the court calendar permits the court system to operate without unnecessary congestion.

Defendant is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept31@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.

Case Number: BC702476    Hearing Date: January 10, 2020    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

JAMES BOLTON,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

XYZ RENT 14, LLC, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

Case No.: BC702476

[TENTATIVE] ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

January 10, 2020

Defendants’ Motion to Compel is premature and will be continued to a new date as set forth below.  The parties are scheduled to participate in an Informal Discovery Conference (“IDC”) on 1/07/20, only three days before the hearing on this motion.  The Court needs to have IDCs take place at least two weeks prior to hearings on MTCFs, to enable the parties to resolve their issues prior to the Court preparing the motion for hearing. 

Additionally, the Court notes that Defendant scheduled the hearing on the motion for 1:30 p.m.  The Court hears MTCFs at 10:00 a.m.

The hearing on the MTFC is continued to Monday, 1/21/20 at 10:00 a.m. in Department 3 of the Spring Street Courthouse.  If the above date is not convenient for the parties, Moving Party must use the online reservation system to promptly continue the hearing on the motion to a date at least two weeks after the IDC. 

Defendant is ordered to give notice. 

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar.  If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.  

Case Number: BC702476    Hearing Date: January 08, 2020    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

JAMES BOLTON,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

XYZ RENT 14, LLC, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

Case No.: BC702476

[TENTATIVE] ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

January 10, 2020

Defendants’ Motion to Compel is premature and will be continued to a new date as set forth below.  The parties are scheduled to participate in an Informal Discovery Conference (“IDC”) on 1/07/20, only three days before the hearing on this motion.  The Court needs to have IDCs take place at least two weeks prior to hearings on MTCFs, to enable the parties to resolve their issues prior to the Court preparing the motion for hearing. 

Additionally, the Court notes that Defendant scheduled the hearing on the motion for 1:30 p.m.  The Court hears MTCFs at 10:00 a.m.

The hearing on the MTFC is continued to Monday, 1/21/20 at 10:00 a.m. in Department 3 of the Spring Street Courthouse.  If the above date is not convenient for the parties, Moving Party must use the online reservation system to promptly continue the hearing on the motion to a date at least two weeks after the IDC. 

Defendant is ordered to give notice. 

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar.  If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.