This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/10/2019 at 02:56:15 (UTC).

JAMES A KAY JR VS FRANKLIN S ADLER

Case Summary

On 01/19/2018 a Contract - Professional Negligence case was filed by JAMES A KAY JR against FRANKLIN S ADLER in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0970

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

MICHAEL JOHNSON

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

KAY JAMES A. JR.

Respondents and Defendants

DOES 1 TO 20

ADLER FRANKLIN S.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

9/26/2019: Request for Dismissal

Exhibit List

7/2/2019: Exhibit List

Witness List

7/2/2019: Witness List

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-SETTLEMENT STATUS CONFERENCE)

4/23/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-SETTLEMENT STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Post-Settlement Status Conference)

3/6/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Post-Settlement Status Conference)

Minute Order -

6/4/2018: Minute Order -

Case Management Statement

10/29/2018: Case Management Statement

NOTICE OF TRIAL AND PRECEEDING DATES

6/8/2018: NOTICE OF TRIAL AND PRECEEDING DATES

Minute Order -

5/24/2018: Minute Order -

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

5/31/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

5/31/2018: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., SECTION 170.6)

3/21/2018: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., SECTION 170.6)

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/22/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/9/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT FRANKLIN S. ADLER

3/9/2018: NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT FRANKLIN S. ADLER

Minute Order -

1/30/2018: Minute Order -

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC. 170.6)

1/29/2018: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC. 170.6)

SUMMONS -

1/19/2018: SUMMONS -

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2019
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by James A. Jr. Kay (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (FOR A TRIAL CONTINUANCE BASED ON THE UNAVAILABILITY OF EXPERT WITNESS ANDRE E. JARDINI) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Application (FOR A TRIAL CONTINUANCE BASED ON THE UNAVAILABILITY OF EXPERT WITNESS ANDRE E. JARDINI); Filed by James A. Jr. Kay (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • Docketat 00:00 AM in Department 56; (Affidavit of Prejudice; Court Disqualifies Self) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-01-30 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by James A. Jr. Kay (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketPEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC. 170.6)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by James A. Jr. Kay (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR (1) BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY; (2) BREACH OF CONTRACT; AND (3) AN ACCOUNTING

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

Timothy D. McGonigle, Esq. (State Bar No. 115979) TIMOTHY D. McGONIGLE PROF. CORP.

1880 Century Park East, Suite 516

Los Angeles,-California 90067

Telephone: (310) 478-7110

'} Facsimile: (888) 266-9410

Attorney for Plaintiff James A. Kay, Jr.

rTTTToTTsirTrTrissrsrrrrrrrrrreres—p————————————E T\40

of reasonable diligence.

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES FILED

Sc.@erlor Court of Callf ountv of | ne Annnlg:ma

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA 4 MAR 09 2018

SBI;GM R.¢ uuve Ufficen/Clerk den Dopun

BY FAX

| JAMES A. KAY, JR., an individual, - Case No. BC690970

| [Case Previously Assigned to Hon Mlchael g Johnson, Department 56)

‘ - - "[Case Reassigned to Hon. Gregory Alarcon, Plalfltlff, . Department 36]

V. NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF , | - SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND ~ FRANKLIN S. ADLER, an individual; and COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT Does 1 to 20, FRANKLIN S. ADLER Defendants.

{ TO ALL PARTIES AND THEIR ATTORNEYS OF RECORD:

PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that Plaintiff James A. Kay, Jr. hereby files notice of filing proof of

service of Summons and Complamt on Defendant Franklin S. Adler as follows:

FRAN KLN S. ADLER an individual, which was served by substituted service on February 22, 2018, by leaving the documents in the presence of "Jane Doe," receptionist, apparently

in charge. Please see attached proof of service, declaration of mailing, and declaration