This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/09/2022 at 03:00:31 (UTC).

JAMEE BALL VS WEST HILLS HOSPITAL, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 06/30/2021 JAMEE BALL filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against WEST HILLS HOSPITAL, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA M. SCHEPER. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4123

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA M. SCHEPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BALL JAMEE

Defendant

WEST HILLS HOSPITAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DELUYA TALYA TAMAR

FUND CATHRYN G. ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

GOODMAN DANIELLE RUTH

JAMES JOHNNIE A.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

7/2/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/7/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

7/8/2021: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE;)

7/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE;)

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

7/14/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/16/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

7/27/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Answer

8/2/2021: Answer

Notice - NOTICE CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS

8/18/2021: Notice - NOTICE CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/16/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

11/16/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

11/16/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Settlement

1/21/2022: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE)

1/21/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE) OF 01/21/2022

1/21/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE) OF 01/21/2022

Request for Dismissal

2/3/2022: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

2/10/2022: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by West Hills Hospital (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (With prejudice, Entire Action); Filed by Jamee Ball (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • Docketat 11:42 AM in Department 40; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case) of 01/21/2022); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Jamee Ball (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 07/14/2021
  • Docketat 3:48 PM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Peremptory Challenge;)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Jamee Ball (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jamee Ball (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jamee Ball (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jamee Ball (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jamee Ball (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less