This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/02/2022 at 03:31:02 (UTC).

JAMBAX 2, LLC, ET AL. VS CIVIC FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/30/2021 JAMBAX 2, LLC filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against CIVIC FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1602

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JAMBAX 2 LLC

KIHAGI ANNE

Defendants

CIVIC FINANCIAL SERVICES INC

PACIFIC WESTERN BANK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIHAGI ANNA

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/1/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/30/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

9/30/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/30/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 03/30/2022

3/30/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 03/30/2022

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO APPEAR ON 03/30/22; ORDER ...) OF 04/29/2022

4/29/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO APPEAR ON 03/30/22; ORDER ...) OF 04/29/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO APPEAR ON 03/30/22; ORDER ...)

4/29/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO APPEAR ON 03/30/22; ORDER ...)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department P; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department P; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department P; Order to Show Cause Re: (Failure to Appear on 03/30/22) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department P; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Appear on 03/30/22; Order ...) of 04/29/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Appear on 03/30/22; Order ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department P; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 03/30/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JAMBAX 2, LLC (Plaintiff); ANNE KIHAGI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JAMBAX 2, LLC (Plaintiff); ANNE KIHAGI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JAMBAX 2, LLC (Plaintiff); ANNE KIHAGI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PACIFIC WESTERN BANK A CALIFORNIA STATE-CHARTERED BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where CIVIC FINANCIAL SERVICES A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIHAGI ANNA