This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/26/2021 at 15:10:06 (UTC).

JAMARRE ANDERSON VS DAE'SHA MONIQUE SHANNON

Case Summary

On 07/23/2021 JAMARRE ANDERSON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DAE'SHA MONIQUE SHANNON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7116

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANDERSON JAMARRE

Defendant

SHANNON DAE'SHA MONIQUE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BEUGELMANS JACQUES

Defendant Attorney

HILL GEOFFREY T.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/23/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/23/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/23/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/23/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF SERVICE OF PROCESS ON DEFENDANT

9/1/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF SERVICE OF PROCESS ON DEFENDANT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

8/5/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

8/5/2021: PI General Order

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/9/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

9/9/2021: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2024
  • Hearing07/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • Hearing01/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • Hearing01/06/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by DAE'SHA MONIQUE SHANNON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by DAE'SHA MONIQUE SHANNON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF SERVICE OF PROCESS ON DEFENDANT); Filed by JAMARRE ANDERSON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JAMARRE ANDERSON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JAMARRE ANDERSON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by JAMARRE ANDERSON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HILL GEOFFREY T.