This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/27/2022 at 20:55:34 (UTC).

JAMAL BIRDO VS PROPARK AMERICA WEST, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/29/2022 JAMAL BIRDO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against PROPARK AMERICA WEST, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0999

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BIRDO JAMAL

Defendant

PROPARK AMERICA WEST LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DE SARIO JAMES A.

MEDINA IVAN P.

NOURMAND MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/30/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/29/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/29/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/29/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/29/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

7/25/2022: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2022
  • Hearing12/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department O at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jamal Birdo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jamal Birdo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jamal Birdo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jamal Birdo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Propark America West, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEDINA IVAN P.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DE SARIO JAMES A.