This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/25/2021 at 04:40:45 (UTC).

JALON JOHNSON VS ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR COMPANY OF LOS ANGELES, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/21/2021 JALON JOHNSON filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR COMPANY OF LOS ANGELES, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5112

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHNSON JALON

Defendant

ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR COMPANY OF LOS ANGELES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALEMZADEH BERKEH

Defendant Attorney

QUINN MONICA MARTELLI

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE PLAINITFFS STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

9/16/2021: Notice - NOTICE PLAINITFFS STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

Notice of Settlement

9/8/2021: Notice of Settlement

Declaration - DECLARATION OF BERKEH ALEMZADEH IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION

7/27/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF BERKEH ALEMZADEH IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION

Request for Judicial Notice - REQUEST REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL

7/27/2021: Request for Judicial Notice - REQUEST REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF

7/27/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF

Declaration - DECLARATION DEFENDANTS REPLY BRIEF REGARDING ITS MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF

8/2/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DEFENDANTS REPLY BRIEF REGARDING ITS MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF

Reply - REPLY DEFENDANTS REPLY BRIEF REGARDING ITS MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF

8/2/2021: Reply - REPLY DEFENDANTS REPLY BRIEF REGARDING ITS MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF

Notice of Ruling

8/9/2021: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION)

8/9/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION)

Answer

6/1/2021: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE)

6/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING DATE ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S DEPOSITION

5/21/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING DATE ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S DEPOSITION

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/26/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

4/26/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/27/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR DEPARTMENT 69 ONLINE COURTROOM INFORMATION

4/27/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR DEPARTMENT 69 ONLINE COURTROOM INFORMATION

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

4/27/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketNotice (PLAINITFF?S STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT); Filed by Jalon Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Motion to Compel Deposition)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Sanctions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Motion to Compel Deposition) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Jalon Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Deposition) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Deposition)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jalon Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Department 69 Online Courtroom Information); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jalon Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Jalon Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jalon Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jalon Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jalon Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALEMZADEH BERKEH