This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/21/2020 at 00:31:37 (UTC).

JALEEL MELENDEZ VS PINETREE TERRACE APARTMENTS ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/01/2018 JALEEL MELENDEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PINETREE TERRACE APARTMENTS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2559

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MELENDEZ JALEEL

Defendants and Respondents

PINETREE TERRACE APARTMENTS

MABRY MANAGEMENT CO. INC

DOES 1 TO 50

PINETREE INVESTMENTS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

EISON OWILI K. ESQ.

EISON OWILI KING ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

BOUCHE JACQUELINE ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Mail

3/16/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

2/18/2020: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FOR ATTORNEY RAUL...)

2/18/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FOR ATTORNEY RAUL...)

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION OF RAUL J. OCAMPO

12/19/2019: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION OF RAUL J. OCAMPO

Proof of Service by Mail

12/23/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE BY...)

12/23/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE BY...)

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

1/16/2020: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

1/16/2020: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

5/31/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF MAILING ADDRESS

9/14/2018: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF MAILING ADDRESS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

4/17/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

SUMMONS -

4/17/2018: SUMMONS -

ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/14/2018: ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

5/14/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

3/5/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

3/22/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

SUMMONS -

2/1/2018: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

2/1/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2021
  • Hearing02/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; : OSC RE Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • Hearing07/08/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • Hearing06/24/2020 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Jaleel Melendez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 27, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel (for Attorney Raul Ocampo as to Plaintiff Jaleel Melendez) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel for Attorney Raul...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketOrder Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by Owili King Eison, Esq. (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4B; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4B; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by Owili King Eison, Esq. (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 04/17/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Jaleel Melendez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Jaleel Melendez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Jaleel Melendez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jaleel Melendez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC692559    Hearing Date: February 18, 2020    Dept: 27

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: MOTION TO BE RELIEVED

Raul Ocampo seeks to be relieved as counsel of record for plaintiff Jaleel Melendez (“Plaintiff”) on grounds that there has been a significant breakdown in the attorney-client relationship which has significantly impeded counsel’s ability to prosecute this case and represent Plaintiff’s interest. Absent a showing of resulting prejudice, an attorney’s request for withdrawal should be granted. (People v. Prince (1968) 268 Cal.App.2d 398, 406.) The Court notes that trial in this matter is currently set for July 8, 2020, and no prejudice will result from granting this motion. Accordingly, this unopposed motion to be relieved is GRANTED and effective upon filing a proof of service showing service of the order on Plaintiff and all parties who have appeared.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT27@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative.