This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/22/2021 at 20:17:21 (UTC).

JAKLIN SHALLHOOB VS U-HAUL CO. OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/21/2021 JAKLIN SHALLHOOB filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against U-HAUL CO OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4732

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHALLHOOB JAKLIN

Defendants

DUENAS JONATHAN

U-HAUL CO. OF CALIFORNIA A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AIRAPETIAN STEPHAN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/21/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/21/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/21/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/21/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2024
  • Hearing09/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • Hearing03/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • Hearing03/07/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jaklin Shallhoob (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jaklin Shallhoob (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jaklin Shallhoob (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U-HAUL CO. OF CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AIRAPETIAN STEPHAN