This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/09/2023 at 06:37:07 (UTC).

JAKLIN HAYRAPETIAN, ET AL. VS LIVANOVA DEUTSCHLAND, GMBH, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/26/2023 JAKLIN HAYRAPETIAN, filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against LIVANOVA DEUTSCHLAND, GMBH,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1713

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HAYRAPETIAN ALEX SOLTAN

HAYRAPETIAN JAKLIN

HAYRAPETIAN MICHAEL SOLTAN

Defendants

KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC.

KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS

LIVANOVA DEUTSCHLAND GMBH AKA SORIN GROUP DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

LIVANOVA HOLDING USA INC. AKA SORIN GROUP USA INC.

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAUFMAN PETER LAWRENCE

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

3/8/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

3/8/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 03/08/2023

3/8/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 03/08/2023

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 03/08/2023

3/8/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 03/08/2023

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION

3/2/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION

Notice of Related Case

2/27/2023: Notice of Related Case

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

2/24/2023: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

2/24/2023: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION)

2/24/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION) OF 02/24/2023

2/24/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION) OF 02/24/2023

Proof of Personal Service

2/16/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/16/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/16/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of OSC - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE: SETTING CASE FOR HEARING

2/10/2023: Notice of OSC - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE: SETTING CASE FOR HEARING

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. SETTING CASE FOR HEARING;) OF 01/31/2023

1/31/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. SETTING CASE FOR HEARING;) OF 01/31/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. SETTING CASE FOR HEARING;)

1/31/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. SETTING CASE FOR HEARING;)

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/26/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

1/26/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2023
  • Hearing03/24/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 6 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Initial Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketInitial Status Conference scheduled for 03/24/2023 at 09:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketCase numbers 23STCV01713, 20STCV25647 are related; case number 20STCV25647 is the lead case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re Notice of Related Case)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Notice of Related Case) of 03/08/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketCase numbers 20STCV25647, 23STCV01713 are related; case number 20STCV25647 is the lead case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re Initial Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Initial Status Conference) of 03/08/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketNotice of Court Order re: Complex Determination; Filed by: Jaklin Hayrapetian (Plaintiff); Michael Soltan Hayrapetian (Plaintiff); Alex Soltan Hayrapetian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re. Setting Case for Hearing;) of 01/31/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Complex Determination scheduled for 02/24/2023 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jaklin Hayrapetian (Plaintiff); Michael Soltan Hayrapetian (Plaintiff); Alex Soltan Hayrapetian (Plaintiff); As to: Livanova Deutschland, GMBH (Defendant); Livanova Holding USA Inc. (Defendant); Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jaklin Hayrapetian (Plaintiff); Michael Soltan Hayrapetian (Plaintiff); Alex Soltan Hayrapetian (Plaintiff); As to: Livanova Deutschland, GMBH (Defendant); Livanova Holding USA Inc. (Defendant); Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jaklin Hayrapetian (Plaintiff); Michael Soltan Hayrapetian (Plaintiff); Alex Soltan Hayrapetian (Plaintiff); As to: Livanova Deutschland, GMBH (Defendant); Livanova Holding USA Inc. (Defendant); Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketCase assigned in Department 11 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less