This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/25/2022 at 03:09:05 (UTC).

JAKICA BACIC VS SILVERLAKE MEDICAL CENTER

Case Summary

On 08/02/2017 JAKICA BACIC filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against SILVERLAKE MEDICAL CENTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL E. WHITAKER, STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH and ELAINE LU. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0665

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BACIC JAKICA

Defendants

SILVERLAKE MEDICAL CENTER

SUCCESS HEALTHCARE LLC DOE 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

HOYNACKI DAVID A.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY OF DEFENDANT SILVERLAKE MEDI...)

11/22/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY OF DEFENDANT SILVERLAKE MEDI...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY OF DEFENDANT SILVERLAKE MEDI...)

9/22/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY OF DEFENDANT SILVERLAKE MEDI...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY OF DEFENDANT SILVERLAKE MEDI...)

7/21/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY OF DEFENDANT SILVERLAKE MEDI...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY OF DEFENDANT SILVERLAKE MEDI...)

5/16/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY OF DEFENDANT SILVERLAKE MEDI...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY OF DEFENDANT SILVERLAKE MEDI...)

3/4/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY OF DEFENDANT SILVERLAKE MEDI...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS; STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANK...)

8/24/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS; STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANK...)

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

3/15/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION RE: SERVICE OF ORDER RELIEVING COUNSEL

3/15/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION RE: SERVICE OF ORDER RELIEVING COUNSEL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY OF DEFENDANT SILVERLAKE MEDI...)

2/17/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY OF DEFENDANT SILVERLAKE MEDI...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY OF DEFENDANT SILVERLAKE MEDI...)

2/10/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY OF DEFENDANT SILVERLAKE MEDI...)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SERVICE OF ORDER RELIEVING COUNSEL

12/9/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SERVICE OF ORDER RELIEVING COUNSEL

Response - RESPONSE DEFENDANT RESPONSE TO THIS COURT ORDER DATED OCTOBER 16, 2020

11/25/2020: Response - RESPONSE DEFENDANT RESPONSE TO THIS COURT ORDER DATED OCTOBER 16, 2020

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DAVID A. HOYNACKI IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO THIS COURT ORDER DATED OCTOBER 16, 2020

11/25/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DAVID A. HOYNACKI IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO THIS COURT ORDER DATED OCTOBER 16, 2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY OF DEFENDANT SILVERLAKE MEDI...)

12/8/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY OF DEFENDANT SILVERLAKE MEDI...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY OF DEFENDANT SILVERLAKE MEDI...) OF 12/08/2020

12/8/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY OF DEFENDANT SILVERLAKE MEDI...) OF 12/08/2020

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (LEGACY EVENT TYPE : OSC RE DISMISSAL; STATUS CONFERENCE RE: B...) OF 10/16/2020

10/16/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (LEGACY EVENT TYPE : OSC RE DISMISSAL; STATUS CONFERENCE RE: B...) OF 10/16/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (LEGACY EVENT TYPE : OSC RE DISMISSAL; STATUS CONFERENCE RE: B...)

10/16/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (LEGACY EVENT TYPE : OSC RE DISMISSAL; STATUS CONFERENCE RE: B...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)

2/4/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2023
  • Hearing02/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy (of Defendant Silverlake Medical Center / alternative Trial Setting Conference) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy of Defendant Silverlake Medi...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 32; Hearing on Motion to Dismiss - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy (of Defendant Silverlake Medical Center / alternative Trial Setting Conference) - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy of Defendant Silverlake Medi...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy (of Defendant Silverlake Medical Center / alternative Trial Setting Conference) - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy of Defendant Silverlake Medi...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy (of Defendant Silverlake Medical Center / alternative Trial Setting Conference) - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy of Defendant Silverlake Medi...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
94 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Silverlake Medical Center (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketDEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Silverlake Medical Center (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketSILVER LAKE MEDICAL CENTER'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Jakica Bacic (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jakica Bacic (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****0665    Hearing Date: December 08, 2020    Dept: 32

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 32

JAKICA BACIC,

Plaintiff,

v.

SILVER LAKE MEDICAL CENTER,

Defendant.

Case No.: ****0665

Hearing Date: December 8, 2020

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS

Plaintiff Jakica Bacic (“Plaintiff”) filed this action through counsel, Alexander J. Petale (California State Bar #196632), on August 2, 2017, alleging that she slipped and fell on water and ice inside the Silver Lake Medical Center (“Defendant”) while she was recovering from surgery. Defendant is represented by Patrick J. Kearns (California State Bar #241602).

On November 14, 2018, Defendant filed a notice of stay due to bankruptcy proceedings. The Court held a status conference re: bankruptcy of Defendant on December 4, 2019. Neither party appeared. The Court continued the status conference to December 16, 2019. The parties appeared but had no information concerning the status of Defendant’s bankruptcy and whether any potential liability has been discharged. During that hearing, the Court relieved Plaintiff’s counsel but ordered him to serve the order on his client, ruling that he would remain counsel-of-record until he did so. Therefore, the Court continued the status conference to April 15, 2020, and then to August 3, 2020.

On August 3, 2020, Defendant’s counsel did not appear. Plaintiff’s counsel appeared and represented that he required additional time to serve the Court’s order relieving him upon his client because she is in a facility that will not accept service. The Court continued the status conference to October 16, 2020. Neither party’s counsel appeared.

It appears to the Court that counsel for both parties have repeatedly violated this Court’s orders. Messrs. Petale and Kearns have repeatedly failed to appear for status conferences as ordered by the Court, and the Court still has no information whether Defendant’s bankruptcy has discharged any potential liability in this action. In addition, Mr. Petale has not served his client with the Court’s order relieving him as counsel, in violation of this Court’s order. Therefore, the Court issues this Order to Show Cause why Sanctions Should Not Issue (“OSC”) against Alexander J. Petale (California State Bar #196632) and Patrick J. Kearns (California State Bar #241602). The Court provides notice that it is considering the following sanctions:

1. Monetary sanctions in the amount of $1,000 or less against Mr. Petale.

2. Monetary sanctions in the amount of $1,000 or less against Mr. Kearns.

3. Monetary sanctions in the amount of $1,000 or less against Defendant.

4. A referral to the California State Bar Association against Mr. Petale for not informing his client of having been relieved as counsel for over ten months, which may constitute abandonment and may have jeopardized Plaintiff’s rights and remedies in this case.

5. A referral to the California State Bar Association against Mr. Kearns for failing to appear as ordered at numerous status conferences for approximately one year.

Mr. Petale may file a response, which may include a proof of service of the Court’s order relieving him as counsel, on or before November 30, 2020. Mr. Kearns may file a response, which may include an update on Defendant’s bankruptcy, on or before November 30, 2020. The Court shall hold the OSC in this matter on December 8, 2020, at 1:30 p.m. If Messrs. Petale and/or Kearns do not appear at the hearing, the respective counsel shall waive his right to be heard and shall submit to the Court ordering sanctions against the respective counsel. The Court authorizes remote appearances via LACourtConnect.

The Court’s clerk shall serve this order upon Messrs. Petale and Kearns.

DATED: October 16, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court



Case Number: ****0665    Hearing Date: December 16, 2019    Dept: 5

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 5

jakika bacic,

Plaintiff,

v.

silverlake medical center,

Defendant.

Case No.: ****0665

Hearing Date: December 16, 2019

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

motion to be relieved as counsel

Attorney Alexander J. Petale (“Counsel”) moves to be relieved as counsel for Plaintiff Jakika Bacic (“Plaintiff”). The motion is granted.

Counsel has filed forms MC-051 and MC-052 and has lodged with the Court a copy of the proposed order on form MC-053 as required. (Cal Rules of Court, rule 3.1362.) The basis for this motion is a breakdown in the attorney-client relationship. That is a valid basis for withdrawal. Accordingly, the motion is granted.

Counsel should note that the order will become effective upon the filing of proof of service of a signed copy of the order on Plaintiff. Counsel will remain the attorney of record until Counsel files with the court proof of service of the signed order. Counsel must serve a copy of the signed order (form MC-053) on Plaintiff within 10 days, and file proof of service thereof.

DATED: December 16, 2019 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SILVERLAKE MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOYNACKI DAVID A.