This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/01/2021 at 16:43:26 (UTC).

JAKEIMA ROHRBACH VS COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/25/2020 JAKEIMA ROHRBACH filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5465

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROHRBACH JAKEIMA

Defendants

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

SHERIFF"S DEPARTMENT OF LOS ANGELES

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GIRARDI THOMAS V

REKTE ANDRE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2023
  • Hearing11/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • Hearing05/25/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • Hearing05/11/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Jakeima Rohrbach (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jakeima Rohrbach (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jakeima Rohrbach (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jakeima Rohrbach (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer REKTE ANDRE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GIRARDI THOMAS V.