This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/17/2021 at 07:26:19 (UTC).

JAJ3, LLC VS CARY BREN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/20/2021 JAJ3, LLC filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against CARY BREN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0722

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAJ3 LLC

Defendants

PLCC1 LLC

CARY BREN

PORTLAND LLOYD CENTER COMMUNITY LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BISNO ROBERT

Defendant Attorneys

JARRELL CHARLES

JARRELL ESQ CHARLES D

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT OFF CALENDAR

6/25/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT OFF CALENDAR

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

6/7/2021: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

6/14/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/20/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/20/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/20/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/20/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

4/20/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2021
  • Hearing10/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Taking Defendant?s Demurrer to Complaint Off Calendar); Filed by Cary Bren (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by JAJ3, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by Cary Bren (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by JAJ3, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JAJ3, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JAJ3, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BISNO ROBERT