This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/27/2021 at 08:22:09 (UTC).

JAIN (F/K/A SMITHA CHALGERI), SMITHA VS CHALGERI, RAJU

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 JAIN F/K/A SMITHA CHALGERI , SMITHA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CHALGERI, RAJU. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WEINGART, GREGORY J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1758

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WEINGART, GREGORY J

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JAIN F/K/A SMITHA CHALGERI SMITHA

Respondent

CHALGERI RAJU

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BARNHOLTZ BRADLEY CHANCE

Respondent Attorney

ROSENTHAL LISA FRANCINE

 

Court Documents

Notice - Case Assignment

10/12/2021: Notice - Case Assignment

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

10/12/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

10/12/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

10/12/2021: Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

Summons

10/12/2021: Summons

Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation - Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

11/19/2021: Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation - Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

Minute Order

11/2/2021: Minute Order

Memorandum - Points and Authorities - Memorandum - Points and Authorities

12/20/2021: Memorandum - Points and Authorities - Memorandum - Points and Authorities

Declaration - Declaration of Brad Barnholtz in Support of OSC re Contempt

12/20/2021: Declaration - Declaration of Brad Barnholtz in Support of OSC re Contempt

Order - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

12/22/2021: Order - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

Memorandum - Points and Authorities - Memorandum - Points and Authorities

12/21/2021: Memorandum - Points and Authorities - Memorandum - Points and Authorities

RFO/MTN - Reconsideration

12/21/2021: RFO/MTN - Reconsideration

Declaration - Declaration of Brad Barnholtz in Support of OSC re Contempt

12/21/2021: Declaration - Declaration of Brad Barnholtz in Support of OSC re Contempt

Memorandum - Points and Authorities - Memorandum - Points and Authorities

12/21/2021: Memorandum - Points and Authorities - Memorandum - Points and Authorities

Declaration - Declaration of Brad Barnholtz in Support of Motion for Reconsideration

12/21/2021: Declaration - Declaration of Brad Barnholtz in Support of Motion for Reconsideration

OSC - Re Contempt

12/21/2021: OSC - Re Contempt

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2022
  • Hearing03/14/2022 at 8:30 AM in Department F48 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause re: Contempt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketOrder - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketOSC - Re Contempt; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketMemorandum - Points and Authorities (Memorandum - Points and Authorities ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Brad Barnholtz in Support of OSC re Contempt ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Brad Barnholtz in Support of Motion for Reconsideration ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketMemorandum - Points and Authorities (Memorandum - Points and Authorities ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketRFO/MTN - Reconsideration; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Brad Barnholtz in Support of OSC re Contempt ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketMemorandum - Points and Authorities (Memorandum - Points and Authorities ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation (Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department B, Weingart, Gregory J, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review - Not Held - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARNHOLTZ BRADLEY CHANCE