This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/15/2019 at 10:31:39 (UTC).

JAIME LINARES VS NANCY MORALES ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/13/2018 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by JAIME LINARES against NANCY MORALES in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7789

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

LINARES JAIME

Respondents and Defendants

GONZALEZ JOSE

DOES 1 TO 25 INCLUSIVE

MORALES NANCY

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

9/13/2019: Minute Order

Order - Dismissal

9/13/2019: Order - Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for

9/13/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

Minute Order

8/27/2019: Minute Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/13/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons

3/13/2018: Summons

Complaint

3/13/2018: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Jury Trial - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Jury Trial) of 09/13/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Jury Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Jaime Linares (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jaime Linares (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet /Addendum

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC697789    Hearing Date: November 06, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

JAIME LINARES,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

NANCY MORALES, et al.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

Case No.: BC697789

[TENTATIVE] ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO VACATE DISMISSAL

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

November 6, 2019

Plaintiff, Jamie Linares filed this action against Defendants, Nancy Morales and Jose Gonzalez for damages arising out of an automobile v. horse accident.  Plaintiff filed the complaint on 3/13/18.  Plaintiff has not, to date, filed proof of service of the summons and complaint on Defendant.   Plaintiff failed to appear at the 8/27/19 FSC or the 9/13/19 trial.  On 9/13/19, the Court dismissed the case.

At this time, Plaintiff moves to set aside the dismissal.  Plaintiff’s attorney declares the failure to appear at the FSC and trial was due to a calendaring error in her office.  The motion is granted.  CCP §473(b). 

The Court sets an OSC re: dismissal for failure to prosecute/proof of service, and trial setting conference for Monday, 3/16/20 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 3 of the Spring Street Courthouse. 

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar.  If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.