This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/18/2022 at 06:28:16 (UTC).

JAIME HUERTA, SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE ON BEHALF OF THE ROSARIO HUERTA LIVING TRUST DATED 02/19/2020, ET AL. VS MARICELA HUERTA

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 JAIME HUERTA, SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE ON BEHALF OF THE ROSARIO HUERTA LIVING TRUST DATED 02/19/2020 filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against MARICELA HUERTA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MALCOLM MACKEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4334

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MALCOLM MACKEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JAIME HUERTA SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE ON BEHALF OF THE ROSARIO HUERTA LIVING TRUST

HUERTA ROSARIO

Defendant

HUERTA MARICELA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RODRIGUEZ RENAY GRACE

Defendant Attorney

VALENZUELA REYES

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/15/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/15/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/6/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTO EXTENSION

5/20/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTO EXTENSION

Answer

6/28/2021: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

7/29/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF TRIAL, FSC, MEDIATION AND CUT-OFF DATES

7/29/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF TRIAL, FSC, MEDIATION AND CUT-OFF DATES

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 07/29/2021

7/29/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 07/29/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2023
  • Hearing02/06/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 55 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • Hearing01/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 55 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Trial, FSC, Mediation and Cut-Off Dates); Filed by JAIME HUERTA, Successor Trustee on behalf of the ROSARIO HUERTA LIVING TRUST dated 02/19/2020 (Plaintiff); ROSARIO HUERTA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by JAIME HUERTA, Successor Trustee on behalf of the ROSARIO HUERTA LIVING TRUST dated 02/19/2020 (Plaintiff); ROSARIO HUERTA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 07/29/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by MARICELA HUERTA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Demurring or Moving Party In Support of Auto Extension); Filed by MARICELA HUERTA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by JAIME HUERTA, Successor Trustee on behalf of the ROSARIO HUERTA LIVING TRUST dated 02/19/2020 (Plaintiff); ROSARIO HUERTA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JAIME HUERTA, Successor Trustee on behalf of the ROSARIO HUERTA LIVING TRUST dated 02/19/2020 (Plaintiff); ROSARIO HUERTA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JAIME HUERTA, Successor Trustee on behalf of the ROSARIO HUERTA LIVING TRUST dated 02/19/2020 (Plaintiff); ROSARIO HUERTA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less