This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/12/2022 at 09:32:34 (UTC).

JAIME CAMILO CAMARENA-REGALADO VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP, A PARTNERSHIP,, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/15/2022 JAIME CAMILO CAMARENA-REGALADO filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP, A PARTNERSHIP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2938

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAMARENA-REGALADO JAIME CAMILO

Defendants

KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC. A CORPORATION

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP A PARTNERSHIP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RAGER JEFFREY ANDREW

YOON JAMES Y.

GARAY ASHLEY JESSICA

Defendant Attorney

YOUSEFZADEH BABAK

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/18/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

7/15/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

7/15/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

7/15/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/15/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/15/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/15/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

7/15/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/15/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

8/2/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/2/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

8/24/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

8/24/2022: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Answer

8/23/2022: Answer

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2022
  • Hearing11/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 48 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP, a partnership, (Defendant); KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC., a corporation, (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP, a partnership, (Defendant); KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC., a corporation, (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP, a partnership, (Defendant); KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC., a corporation, (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jaime Camilo Camarena-Regalado (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jaime Camilo Camarena-Regalado (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jaime Camilo Camarena-Regalado (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jaime Camilo Camarena-Regalado (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jaime Camilo Camarena-Regalado (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jaime Camilo Camarena-Regalado (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YOUSEFZADEH, BABAK G.