This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/23/2021 at 18:30:18 (UTC).

JAHSHA BLUNTT VS MORDECHAI KIRSCHENBAUM, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/06/2020 JAHSHA BLUNTT filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MORDECHAI KIRSCHENBAUM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8272

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BLUNTT JAHSHA

Defendants and Cross Defendants

ZEEB AARON

KIRSCHENBAUM MORDECHAI

DOES 1-10

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

KIRSCHENBAUM MORDECHAI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BERRIZ ARMANDO J.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

REEVES SHERYL LEE

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/6/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/6/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/6/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/6/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

10/26/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURE AND HEARING DATES

10/26/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURE AND HEARING DATES

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/23/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/23/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

12/18/2020: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Answer

12/18/2020: Answer

Cross-Complaint

12/18/2020: Cross-Complaint

Request for Dismissal

2/16/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

3/12/2021: Request for Dismissal

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2023
  • Hearing10/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • Hearing04/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • Hearing03/22/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Jahsha Bluntt (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Jahsha Bluntt (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketSummons (Cross-Complaint); Filed by Mordechai Kirschenbaum (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Mordechai Kirschenbaum (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Mordechai Kirschenbaum (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedure and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Jahsha Bluntt (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Jahsha Bluntt (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jahsha Bluntt (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jahsha Bluntt (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jahsha Bluntt (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer REEVES SHERYL LEE