This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/21/2023 at 08:38:32 (UTC).

JAHAN F. HANDJANI VS PERSHING SECURITIES BROKERS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/17/2022 JAHAN F HANDJANI filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against PERSHING SECURITIES BROKERS,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL C. KELLEY and DANIEL L. ALEXANDER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0884

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHAEL C. KELLEY

DANIEL L. ALEXANDER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HANDJANI JAHAN F.

Defendants

AMERICAN CENTURY BROKERAGE

BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

FINRA

PERSHING SECURITIES BROKERS

SECURITY AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION

SIPC

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/17/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/17/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/17/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

11/17/2022: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Complaint

11/17/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/17/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/17/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

11/17/2022: Complaint

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/22/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 03/22/2023

3/22/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 03/22/2023

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

3/27/2023: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/11/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 05/11/2023

5/11/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 05/11/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/17/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

8/30/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/15/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2024
  • Hearing01/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Order to Show Cause Re: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Service scheduled for 01/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 09/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 09/15/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service): As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 09/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 09/15/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Complaint: As To Parties changed from Bank of New York Mellon (Defendant), Pershing Securities Brokers (Defendant), Security and Exchange Commission (Defendant), FINRA (Defendant), American Century Brokerage (Defendant), SIPC (Defendant) to Bank of New York Mellon (Defendant), Pershing Securities Brokers (Defendant), Security and Exchange Commission (Defendant), American Century Brokerage (Defendant), SIPC (Defendant), FINRA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Summons on Complaint: As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Civil Case Cover Sheet: As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jahan F. Handjani (Plaintiff); As to: Pershing Securities Brokers (Defendant); Bank of New York Mellon (Defendant); American Century Brokerage (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Jahan F. Handjani (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jahan F. Handjani (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael C. Kelley in Department A15 Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less