This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/20/2022 at 06:42:20 (UTC).

JAHAD MUHAMMAD VS BATTLE-TESTED STRATEGIES, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/21/2021 JAHAD MUHAMMAD filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against BATTLE-TESTED STRATEGIES, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MAURICE A. LEITER and DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4869

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MAURICE A. LEITER

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MUHAMMAD JAHAD

Defendants

AMAZON LOGISTICS INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

AMAZON.COM SERVICES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION

BATTLE-TESTED STRATEGIES LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BERENJI SHADIE L.

Defendant Attorneys

GIANG ALBERT QUOC

JOHNSON TIM L.

PERIGOE KELLY L

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

6/24/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Proof of Personal Service

9/28/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/28/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/28/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/28/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Related Case

10/13/2021: Notice of Related Case

Notice - COMPLEX CIVIL CASE QUESTIONNAIRE

10/14/2021: Notice - COMPLEX CIVIL CASE QUESTIONNAIRE

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

10/18/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX CIVIL CASE QUESTIONNAIRE;)

10/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX CIVIL CASE QUESTIONNAIRE;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX CIVIL CASE QUESTIONNAIRE;) OF 10/29/2021

10/29/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX CIVIL CASE QUESTIONNAIRE;) OF 10/29/2021

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

11/1/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

Notice - NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

11/12/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

Answer

11/12/2021: Answer

Notice - NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

11/12/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

Answer

11/17/2021: Answer

Case Management Statement

12/17/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

12/17/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

12/17/2021: Case Management Statement

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2022
  • Hearing12/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 54 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Tim L. Johnson (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 54; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Joint Stipulation to Stay Litigation and Proposed Order); Filed by Jahad Muhammad (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 54; Hearing on Motion for Stay of Proceedings - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 54, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Jahad Muhammad (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Battle-Tested Strategies, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Amazon.com Services, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Defendant); Amazon.com Services LLC, a Delaware limited liability corporation (Defendant); Amazon Logistics, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketComplex Civil Case Questionnaire; Filed by Amazon.com Services, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Defendant); Amazon.com Services LLC, a Delaware limited liability corporation (Defendant); Amazon Logistics, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Amazon Logistics, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jahad Muhammad (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jahad Muhammad (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jahad Muhammad (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jahad Muhammad (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jahad Muhammad (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jahad Muhammad (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Amazon Logistics, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BERENJI SHADIE LATAE