This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/02/2022 at 07:06:05 (UTC).

JAHAD MUHAMMAD VS BATTLE-TESTED STRATEGIES, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/07/2022 JAHAD MUHAMMAD filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against BATTLE-TESTED STRATEGIES, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0781

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MUHAMMAD JAHAD

Defendant

BATTLE-TESTED STRATEGIES LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BERENJI SHADIE L.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/10/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR DEPARTMENT 69 ONLINE COURTROOM INFORMATION

1/10/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR DEPARTMENT 69 ONLINE COURTROOM INFORMATION

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

1/10/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/7/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/7/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/7/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/7/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

1/7/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/7/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Complaint

1/7/2022: Complaint

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

1/20/2022: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED AGAINST...)

1/20/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED AGAINST...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED AGAINST...) OF 01/20/2022

1/20/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED AGAINST...) OF 01/20/2022

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/31/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

1/20/2022: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Request for Dismissal

3/21/2022: Request for Dismissal

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Jahad Muhammad (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • Docketat 11:16 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Jahad Muhammad (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Plaintiff's Peremptory Challenge filed against...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Plaintiff's Peremptory Challenge filed against...) of 01/20/2022); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Department 69 Online Courtroom Information); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jahad Muhammad (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jahad Muhammad (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jahad Muhammad (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BERENJI SHADIE LATAE