Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/15/2020 at 03:47:38 (UTC).

JAGDEEP TUNG VS LARRY MEDLER

Case Summary

On 06/03/2020 JAGDEEP TUNG filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LARRY MEDLER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0917

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TUNG JAGDEEP

Defendant

MEDLER LARRY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DINSMORE SCOTT D.

Defendant Attorney

PERRY ARIELLA

 

Court Documents

Answer

7/24/2020: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/24/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Personal Service

7/28/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/8/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

6/8/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/3/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/3/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/3/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/3/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2023
  • Hearing05/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • Hearing12/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • Hearing11/17/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jagdeep Tung (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Larry Medler (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Larry Medler (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jagdeep Tung (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jagdeep Tung (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jagdeep Tung (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DINSMORE SCOTT D.