This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/30/2022 at 08:53:22 (UTC).

JAE WHAN YOO, ET AL. VS WAG LABS, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/06/2021 JAE WHAN YOO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WAG LABS, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9098

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

YOO IMSOOK

YOO JAE WHAN

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

BRECCIA GAIA

FOUR-THREE-O INC.

WAG LABS INC.

GAVI PROPERTIES LLC

RANDALL-QUANT TIANA

Cross Plaintiffs, Defendants and Cross Defendants

FOUR-THREE-O INC.

WAG LABS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PHILIPS PAUL

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

MARCUCCI GERMAN

DEER JONATHAN MICHAEL

HARMAN KELLEY E.

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

HARMAN KELLEY E.

MILLER CAMERON

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

7/28/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Answer

4/12/2022: Answer

Answer

4/13/2022: Answer

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

4/13/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/13/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

4/14/2022: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

4/14/2022: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

3/21/2022: Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Personal Service

3/28/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/3/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/3/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

9/3/2021: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Answer

9/3/2021: Answer

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

9/3/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Cross-Complaint

9/3/2021: Cross-Complaint

Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer

12/28/2021: Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

1/18/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER OF THE PARTIES

1/24/2022: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER OF THE PARTIES

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2024
  • Hearing08/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • Hearing02/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • Hearing01/20/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Wag Labs, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Jae Whan Yoo (Plaintiff); Imsook Yoo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Gaia Breccia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Jae Whan Yoo (Plaintiff); Imsook Yoo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Wag Labs, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Four-Three-O, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketSummons (Cross-Complaint); Filed by Wag Labs, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Wag Labs, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Jae Whan Yoo (Plaintiff); Imsook Yoo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Jae Whan Yoo (Plaintiff); Imsook Yoo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jae Whan Yoo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jae Whan Yoo (Plaintiff); Imsook Yoo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jae Whan Yoo (Plaintiff); Imsook Yoo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WAG LABS INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PHILIPS PAUL