Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2018 at 05:32:04 (UTC).

JADEN CHRISTOPHER NAVARRO ET AL VS GIOVANNI D'AMORE ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/28/2017 JADEN CHRISTOPHER NAVARRO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GIOVANNI D'AMORE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HOLLY J. FUJIE, YOLANDA OROZCO and ELAINE LU. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9966

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

HOLLY J. FUJIE

YOLANDA OROZCO

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Defendants and Respondents

D'AMORE GIOVANNI

MONARCH FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP THE

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

INCOME ESTATES LLC

Minors

NAVARRO JASPER JOVAN

NAVARRO JADEN CHRISTOPHER

Guardian Ad Litem

RODRIGUEZ PRISCILLA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

CLINTON DAVID A. ESQ.

Minor Attorney

AIN FARRIS E.

 

Court Documents

ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF MINOR'S CLAIM

6/1/2018: ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF MINOR'S CLAIM

ORDER TO DEPOSIT MONEY INTO BLOCKED ACCOUNT

6/1/2018: ORDER TO DEPOSIT MONEY INTO BLOCKED ACCOUNT

PLAINTIFFS' EXPARTE APPLICATION FOR AN AMENDED ORDER APPROVING MINOR'S COMPROMISE; DECLARATION OF CATHERINE LOMBARDO IN SUPPORT THEREOF

6/15/2018: PLAINTIFFS' EXPARTE APPLICATION FOR AN AMENDED ORDER APPROVING MINOR'S COMPROMISE; DECLARATION OF CATHERINE LOMBARDO IN SUPPORT THEREOF

COMPROMISE OF DISPUTING CLAIM

7/3/2018: COMPROMISE OF DISPUTING CLAIM

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

8/6/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

DEFENDANTS, GIOVANNI D'AMORE, INCOME ESTATES, LLC, AND THE MONARCH FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP?S NOTICE OF SECOND CONTINUANCE OF MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS, JADEN NAVARRO AND JASPER NAVARR

3/15/2018: DEFENDANTS, GIOVANNI D'AMORE, INCOME ESTATES, LLC, AND THE MONARCH FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP?S NOTICE OF SECOND CONTINUANCE OF MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS, JADEN NAVARRO AND JASPER NAVARR

ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE PROTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT;MOTION GRANTED

4/4/2018: ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE PROTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT;MOTION GRANTED

Notice of Settlement

5/1/2018: Notice of Settlement

PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGMENT FOR MINOR OR PERSON WITH A DISABILITY

5/15/2018: PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGMENT FOR MINOR OR PERSON WITH A DISABILITY

DECLARATION OF CATHERINE LOMBARDO IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEYS FEES

5/15/2018: DECLARATION OF CATHERINE LOMBARDO IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEYS FEES

DEFENDANTS, GIOVANNI D'AMORE, INCOME ESTATES, LLC, AND THE MONARCH FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND; ETC.

12/5/2017: DEFENDANTS, GIOVANNI D'AMORE, INCOME ESTATES, LLC, AND THE MONARCH FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND; ETC.

Amended Complaint

11/28/2017: Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint

11/30/2017: Amended Complaint

PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS GIOVANNI D'AMORE, INCOME ESTATES, LLC, AND THE MONARCH FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

10/27/2017: PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS GIOVANNI D'AMORE, INCOME ESTATES, LLC, AND THE MONARCH FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: (1) WRONGFUL DEATH; AND (2) SURVIVAL

4/28/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: (1) WRONGFUL DEATH; AND (2) SURVIVAL

Unknown

4/28/2017: Unknown

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

7/24/2017: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF THE HEARING ON DEFENDANTS, GIOVANNI D'AMORE, INCOME ESTATES, LLC, AND THE MONARCH FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS, JADEN NAVARRO AND JASPE

9/1/2017: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF THE HEARING ON DEFENDANTS, GIOVANNI D'AMORE, INCOME ESTATES, LLC, AND THE MONARCH FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS, JADEN NAVARRO AND JASPE

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2018
  • Request for Dismissal (W/ PREJUDICE A/T COMPLAINT/ ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • Order (ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DIPSOITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGMENT FOR MINOR OR PERSON WITH A DISABILITY ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • Notice of Ruling (RE EXPARTE APPLICATION TO AMEND COURT'S ORDER ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • at 08:30 am in Department SS7, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding; Exparte proceeding (FOR AN AMENDED ORDER APPROVINGMINOR'S COMPROMISE) - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • Order (ORDER APPROVING - AMENDED COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM AS TO JAYDEN CHRISTOPHER NAVARRO; FILED ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • Order (order approving ex parte application for an amended order; filed ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • Order (amended order approving compromise of disputed claim; minor as to jasper jovan navarro; filed ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • Miscellaneous-Other (AMENDED ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGMENT FOR MINOR OR PERSON WITH A DISABILITY - JASPER NAVARRO ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • at 08:30 am in Department SS7, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Exparte proceeding - Court makes order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • Ex-Parte Application (PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN AMENDED ORDER APPROVING MINOR'S COMPROMISE; DECLARATION OF CATHERINE LOMBARDO IN SUPPORT THEREOF ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 11/28/2017
  • Amended Complaint (SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • at 01:30 pm in Department 98, Holly J. Fujie, Presiding; Motion to Strike - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • Reply to Motion (TO PAINTIFFS, JADEN NAVARRO AND JASPER NAVARRO'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE UNVERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Opposition Document (TO DEFTS GIOVANNI D'AMORE, INCOME ESTATES LLC & MONARCH FAMILY LP'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLTFS 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • Notice of Continuance (OF THE HEARING ON DEFENDANTS, GIOVANNI D'AMORE, INCOME ESTATES, LLC, AND THE MONARCH FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS, JADEN NAVARRO AND JASPER NAVARRO'S); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • Motion to Strike; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Demurrer; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Motion to Strike; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MONARCH FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP A is a litigant

Latest cases where INCOME ESTATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AIN FARRIS ELIAS