Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/07/2019 at 12:57:35 (UTC).

JADE XU VS CARITAS CHRISTIAN CHURCH ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/18/2017 JADE XU filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against CARITAS CHRISTIAN CHURCH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GREGORY W. ALARCON and DEBRE K. WEINTRAUB. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0162

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GREGORY W. ALARCON

DEBRE K. WEINTRAUB

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

XU JADE

Defendants and Respondents

MA YULIN

CARITAS CHRISTIAN CHURCH

YANG JAMES

YANG SHINEMAY

DOES 1 TO 20

YANG JAMES CHIEN PING

MA MICHAEL

YANG ABRAHAM

MALONE MICHAEL MALU

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

IP EDWARD C. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

FLYNN CYNTHIA ESQ.

DOLCE ADAM

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

3/23/2018: Minute Order

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

1/11/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

1/11/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

1/11/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

2/14/2018: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

Minute Order

12/14/2017: Minute Order

DEFENDANTS' VERIFIED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S VERIFIED COMPLAINT

11/28/2017: DEFENDANTS' VERIFIED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S VERIFIED COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

11/22/2017: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

Proof of Service

11/22/2017: Proof of Service

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/15/2017: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Service

11/3/2017: Proof of Service

Minute Order

10/26/2017: Minute Order

Proof of Service

10/30/2017: Proof of Service

Proof of Service

10/30/2017: Proof of Service

Proof of Service

10/30/2017: Proof of Service

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/31/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

10/18/2017: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

SUMMONS

10/18/2017: SUMMONS

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2018
  • at 00:00 AM in Department 1; (Order ReRelated Cases; Moot) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • at 08:45 AM in Department 28; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2018
  • Notice of Related Case; Filed by JADE XU (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by SHINEMAY YANG (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by YULIN MA (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by JAMES YANG (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by CARITAS CHRISTIAN CHURCH (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2017
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 36; (Affidavit of Prejudice; Case is reassigned) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., 170.6)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by JADE XU (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR 1. INTENTIONAL MISREPRESENTATION; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by JADE XU (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Notice of Related Case; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less