This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/27/2021 at 06:27:46 (UTC).

JADE MARCELIN VS AVI LIDGI, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/20/2021 JADE MARCELIN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AVI LIDGI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4613

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARCELIN JADE

Defendants

LIDGI AVI

REMMET HOA AN UNKNOWN ENTITY TYPE

REMMET HOA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KELLENER JOSEPH W.

KELLENER JOSEPH

Defendant Attorney

CARPENTER GREGORY J.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/21/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/20/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

9/20/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/20/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

10/21/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/21/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

12/17/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/17/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/2/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2022
  • Hearing02/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 15 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Remmet HOA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Remmet HOA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Jade Marcelin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jade Marcelin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jade Marcelin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketComplaint (For Damages And Penalties And Injunction); Filed by Jade Marcelin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jade Marcelin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REMMET HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KELLENER JOSEPH

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KELLENER JOSEPH WIND