This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/17/2021 at 11:22:04 (UTC).

JACQUELYNN HAWKINS VS DAVID BARRY KHAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/04/2020 JACQUELYNN HAWKINS filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against DAVID BARRY KHAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7048

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

HAWKINS JACQUELYNN

SEYEDIAN ELNAZ

WILSHIRE LAW OFFICE

GURSEY SCHNEIDER LLP

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

LAW OFFICES OF BARRY KHAN PC

KHAN DAVID BARRY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

KUNSTLER PETER M.

Defendant Attorney

KHAN BARRY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2021
  • Hearing10/12/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 78 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • Hearing09/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 78 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 78; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees (JACQUELYNN HAWKINS); Filed by Jacquelynn Hawkins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees (David Barry Kahn); Filed by David Barry Khan (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by David Barry Khan (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Jacquelynn Hawkins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Jacquelynn Hawkins (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by David Barry Khan (Defendant); Law Offices of Barry Khan, PC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by David Barry Khan (Defendant); Law Offices of Barry Khan, PC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jacquelynn Hawkins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jacquelynn Hawkins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jacquelynn Hawkins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jacquelynn Hawkins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jacquelynn Hawkins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WILSHIRE LAW OFFICE is a litigant

Latest cases where GURSEY SCHNEIDER LLP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KUNSTLER PETER M.