This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/21/2020 at 04:18:53 (UTC).

JACQUELINE WADDELL VS ASHLEY CONRAD

Case Summary

On 01/25/2018 JACQUELINE WADDELL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ASHLEY CONRAD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SAMANTHA P. JESSNER, ALAN S. ROSENFIELD and YOLANDA OROZCO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1979

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SAMANTHA P. JESSNER

ALAN S. ROSENFIELD

YOLANDA OROZCO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

WADDELL JACQUELINE

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

CONRAD ASHLEY

ASHLEY CONRAD INC (DOE 1)

ASHLEY CONRAD INC DOE 1

ASHLEY CONRAD INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

CLOUGH LARRY HAAKON ESQ.

CLOUGH LARRY HAAKON

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY STATUS; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ...) OF 08/20/2020

8/20/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY STATUS; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ...) OF 08/20/2020

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT; STATUS ...) OF 07/30/2020

7/30/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT; STATUS ...) OF 07/30/2020

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/21/2020

4/21/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/21/2020

Request for Dismissal

11/18/2019: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)

11/19/2019: Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS)

10/29/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS)

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

8/16/2019: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/16/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Publication

7/19/2019: Proof of Publication

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default as to All Defendants)

1/24/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default as to All Defendants)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/17/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

1/4/2019: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Minute Order -

8/17/2018: Minute Order -

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

6/13/2018: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

Minute Order -

5/25/2018: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/8/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

SUMMONS -

1/25/2018: SUMMONS -

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2021
  • Hearing03/16/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 31 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 31, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding; Status Conference (ReBankruptcy Status) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy Status)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding; Status Conference (ReBankruptcy Status) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Request for Default Judgment) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy Status; Order to Show Cause ...) of 08/20/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy Status; Order to Show Cause ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (in response to OSC RE entry of default); Filed by Jacqueline Waddell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Request for Default Judgment) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding; Status Conference (ReBankruptcy Status) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
58 More Docket Entries
  • 04/12/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketAmended Complaint; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jacqueline Waddell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR ACTUAL DAMAGES 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT 2. MONEY HAD AND RECEIVED 3. FRAUD AND NEGLIGENT MISREPRESENTATION

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC691979    Hearing Date: December 30, 2019    Dept: 31

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

On January 25, 2018, Plaintiff Jacqueline Waddell filed the instant action against Defendant Ashley Conrad (the “Individual Defendant”) and Does 1 through 10. The Complaint asserts causes of action for:

  1. Breach of Contract;

  2. Money Had and Received; and

  3. Fraud and Negligent Misrepresentation.

On April 2, 2018, Plaintiff filed an Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name), substituting Ashley Conrad, Inc. (the “Corporate Defendant”) for Doe 1.

On September 6, 2019, default was entered as to the Individual and Corporate Defendants. On November 19, 2019, Defendant Ashley Conrad filed a Notice of Stay of Proceedings as to the Individual Defendant.

Plaintiff seeks judgment against both the Individual and Corporate Defendants jointly and severally in the principal amount of $30,000.00, $4,856.00 in prejudgment interest, an unspecified amount of punitive damages, and $935 in costs.

Plaintiff’s default judgment prove-up papers are deficient. Here, Plaintiff has failed to file a Proof of Service indicating service of the default judgment prove-up papers on Defendants. Plaintiff has also failed to file a cost memorandum supporting the costs sought. Finally, although Plaintiff indicates that she seeks punitive damages against Defendants, Plaintiff has failed to indicate how much in punitive damages she seeks in her proposed judgment. Moreover, the Statement of Damages filed with the Court indicates service only on the Corporate Defendant, yet the proposed judgment seeks punitive damages against both the Individual and Corporate Defendants. The Statement of Damages must be served on all Defendants.

Based on the foregoing, Plaintiff’s request for entry of default judgment is DENIED without prejudice.