This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/19/2020 at 12:00:21 (UTC).

JACQUELINE VIDAL VS. PEOPLE'S FINANCIAL, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/15/2018 JACQUELINE VIDAL filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against PEOPLE'S FINANCIAL, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAURICE A. LEITER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9153

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAURICE A. LEITER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VIDAL JACQUELINE

Carson, CA 90745

Defendants

PEOPLE'S FINANCIAL INC.

LEE MICHAEL H.

DOES 1-15

JUNG ADRIAN

Irvine, CA 92603

Other

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

KIM JI

Attorney at LK Professional Law Group

14730 Beach Blvd Suite 106

La Mirada, CA 90638

 

Court Documents

Status Conference Statement - FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

7/29/2020: Status Conference Statement - FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

Request - REQUEST FOR RECONSIDERATION OF DECISION FOR DEFENDANT'S FALSE CLAIM OF FILING FOR BANKRUPTCY: CONTEMPT AND PLAINTIFF MAKES ACCUSATIONS OF PERJURY

7/29/2020: Request - REQUEST FOR RECONSIDERATION OF DECISION FOR DEFENDANT'S FALSE CLAIM OF FILING FOR BANKRUPTCY: CONTEMPT AND PLAINTIFF MAKES ACCUSATIONS OF PERJURY

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONTEMPT (CC...)

3/3/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONTEMPT (CC...)

Motion for Sanctions

2/10/2020: Motion for Sanctions

Notice of Trial - NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

1/8/2020: Notice of Trial - NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

Request for Judicial Notice

1/8/2020: Request for Judicial Notice

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS ON BANKRUPTCY FILED BY ADRIAN ...)

11/8/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS ON BANKRUPTCY FILED BY ADRIAN ...)

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO PEOPLE'S FINANCIAL, INC ONLY

9/6/2019: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO PEOPLE'S FINANCIAL, INC ONLY

Request for Judicial Notice - Request for Judicial Notice 2nd

2/11/2019: Request for Judicial Notice - Request for Judicial Notice 2nd

Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal...)

1/22/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal...)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal...) of 01/22/2019

1/22/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal...) of 01/22/2019

Notice - Notice Of Order to Show Cause Hearing

1/8/2019: Notice - Notice Of Order to Show Cause Hearing

Opposition - Opposition To motion to compel responses to form interrogatories

1/9/2019: Opposition - Opposition To motion to compel responses to form interrogatories

Other - - Civil Case Cover Sheet- Unlimited

5/15/2018: Other - - Civil Case Cover Sheet- Unlimited

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl

7/16/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl

Case Management Statement

10/22/2018: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) -

10/15/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) -

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) -

7/31/2018: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) -

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2021
  • Hearing01/25/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department A at 200 West Compton Blvd., Compton, CA 90220; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • Hearing01/19/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department A at 200 West Compton Blvd., Compton, CA 90220; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (In Support of Plaintiff's Motion For Summary Judgment Against Defendant Adrian Jung); Filed by Jacqueline Vidal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Motion (for Summary Judgment Against Adrian Jung); Filed by Jacqueline Vidal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (David Daryl Jones Declaration in Support of Plaintiff Jacqueline Vidal's Motion for Summary Judgment Against Defendant Adrian Jung); Filed by Jacqueline Vidal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment (Against Adrian Jung); Filed by Jacqueline Vidal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Hearing on Motion in Limine (to Bifurcate the Defense of Statute of Limitations) - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion in Limine to Bifurcate the Defense of Statu...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
89 More Docket Entries
  • 07/16/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by Jacqueline Vidal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketNotice of Continuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketNotice of Continuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jacqueline Vidal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet- Unlimited

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: TC029153    Hearing Date: August 04, 2020    Dept: A

# 5. Jacqueline Vidal v. People’s Financial, Inc., et al.

Case No.: TC029153

Matter on calendar for: Motion in Limine to Bifurcate Trial

Tentative ruling:

  1. Background

Plaintiff Jacqueline Vidal alleges defendants People’s Financial, Inc., Michael Lee, and Adrian Jang (erroneously sued as Adrian Jung) failed to pay her wages when she worked as secretary for People’s Financial. Adrian Jung and Michael Lee allegedly are the owners. Vidal is self-represented.

Defendant Jang now moves to bifurcate his statute of limitations defense. The motion is opposed.

For the reasons set forth below, the Court denies the motion.

  1. Standard

    Code of Civil Procedure § 597 allows for the bifurcation of special defenses that do not involve the merits of an action: “A separate trial is authorized under [C.C.P § 597] when the defendant alleges as an affirmative defense that the action is time-barred or alleges another affirmative defense that is potentially dispositive and that is one ‘not involving the merits of the [plaintiff’s cause of] action.’ [Citation.]” (Sahadi v. Scheaffer (2007) 155 Cal.App.4th 704, 721–722.)

  2. Analysis

    The Complaint was filed on May 15, 2018. Jang contends, based on evidence submitted in Vidal’s request for default judgment, that the action is barred by the statute of limitations. In opposition, Vidal argues the merits of the defense, which are not at issue on this motion, and does not argue the procedural issue of bifurcation.

Statutes of limitations must be pleaded as an affirmative defense. “There are two ways to properly plead a statute of limitations: (1) allege facts showing that the action is barred, and indicating that the lateness of the action is being urged as a defense and (2) plead the specific section and subdivision. [Citation.]” (Martin v. Van Bergen (2012) 209 Cal.App.4th 84, 91.) Jang’s Answer does not adequately plead this defense.

As the defense is not properly pleaded in the Answer, the motion to bifurcate is improper at this time.

  1. Ruling

    The motion to bifurcate is denied without prejudice.

    Next dates:

    Notice: