This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/18/2022 at 15:13:26 (UTC).

JACQUELINE TAPIA CORTEZ VS WOLFGANG FRIEDRICH

Case Summary

On 10/13/2022 JACQUELINE TAPIA CORTEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against WOLFGANG FRIEDRICH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0994

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TAPIA CORTEZ JACQUELINE

Defendant

FRIEDRICH WOLFGANG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHAMPION KIARASH SHAMLOO

Defendant Attorney

ASLANIAN ARPIE

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/13/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/13/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/13/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/13/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

10/13/2022: Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/19/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/10/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

11/10/2022: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2023
  • Hearing02/21/2023 at 1:30 PM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Wolfgang Friedrich (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Wolfgang Friedrich (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Jacqueline Tapia Cortez (Plaintiff); As to: Wolfgang Friedrich (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/18/2022; Service Cost: 71.76; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jacqueline Tapia Cortez (Plaintiff); As to: Wolfgang Friedrich (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jacqueline Tapia Cortez (Plaintiff); As to: Wolfgang Friedrich (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jacqueline Tapia Cortez (Plaintiff); As to: Wolfgang Friedrich (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/21/2023 at 01:30 PM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Margaret Miller Bernal in Department F Norwalk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less