Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/17/2021 at 20:54:28 (UTC).

JACQUELINE SLUSHER VS SWAIN CHARLES LIVING TRUST, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/28/2020 JACQUELINE SLUSHER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SWAIN CHARLES LIVING TRUST. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL E. WHITAKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1437

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SLUSHER JACQUELINE

Defendants

SWAIN CHARLES LIVING TRUST

CHARLES SWAIN

CHARLES E. SWAIN AS TRUSTEE OF THE CHARLES SWAIN LIVING TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

MIKEL ISSA F.

Other Attorneys

YEAGER KENNETH

 

Court Documents

Answer

2/22/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/22/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

1/22/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Request for Judicial Notice

1/22/2021: Request for Judicial Notice

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

1/22/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

1/22/2021: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Request for Dismissal

1/25/2021: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service

12/15/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/15/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

11/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

11/17/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/28/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/28/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/28/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

10/28/2020: Complaint

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2023
  • Hearing10/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • Hearing04/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • Hearing04/13/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Charles E. Swain, as Trustee of The Charles Swain Living Trust (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Charles E. Swain, as Trustee of The Charles Swain Living Trust (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • Docketat 3:30 PM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Jacqueline Slusher (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by Charles E. Swain, as Trustee of The Charles Swain Living Trust (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by Charles E. Swain, as Trustee of The Charles Swain Living Trust (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike (TO PLAINTIFF JACQUELINE SLUSHER?S COMPLAINT); Filed by Charles E. Swain, as Trustee of The Charles Swain Living Trust (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Jacqueline Slusher (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jacqueline Slusher (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jacqueline Slusher (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jacqueline Slusher (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jacqueline Slusher (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jacqueline Slusher (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer YEAGER KENNETH