This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/20/2020 at 11:23:14 (UTC).

JACQUELINE ROEDER VS PROLACTA BIOSCIENCE, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/21/2019 JACQUELINE ROEDER filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against PROLACTA BIOSCIENCE, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7738

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROEDER JACQUELINE

Defendants

ELSTER SCOTT

PROLACTA BIOSCIENCE INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOSER JANA

Defendant Attorney

RANEN JEFFREY S.

 

Court Documents

Answer

11/12/2019: Answer

Complaint

10/21/2019: Complaint

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE

9/21/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE

Request for Dismissal

7/28/2020: Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE) OF 04/24/2020

4/24/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE) OF 04/24/2020

Case Management Statement

1/8/2020: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...)

1/24/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...)

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

12/5/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER PROTECTIVE CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY

11/26/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER PROTECTIVE CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

11/12/2019: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

11/12/2019: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/6/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

10/28/2019: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/28/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/21/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/21/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/21/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/21/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2021
  • Hearing01/25/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department 58 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • Hearing01/20/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department 58 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • Hearing11/04/2020 at 09:30 AM in Department 58 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • Hearing11/04/2020 at 09:30 AM in Department 58 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Conference Motion Hearing Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • Hearing11/04/2020 at 09:30 AM in Department 58 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 58; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 58; Conference (Motion Hearing Setting) - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 58; Status Conference ((All-Purpose)) - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketOrder (Order Granting Joint Stipulation to Continue Post-Mediation Status Conference); Filed by Jacqueline Roeder (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Joint Stipulation to Continue Post-Mediation Status Conference); Filed by Jacqueline Roeder (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Jacqueline Roeder (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Jacqueline Roeder (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Jacqueline Roeder (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jacqueline Roeder (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jacqueline Roeder (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jacqueline Roeder (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jacqueline Roeder (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less