This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/08/2021 at 19:09:45 (UTC).

JACQUELINE M. THOMAS PAIT, ET AL. VS DELTA AIRLINES, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/16/2020 JACQUELINE M THOMAS PAIT filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DELTA AIRLINES, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0614

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

THOMAS PAIT JACQUELINE M.

BEVANS ANSON

Defendant

DELTA AIRLINES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FIROUZNAM-HEIDARI JENOS

PARVANEH ALI ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

LEWIS AUTUMN ELIZABETH

 

Court Documents

Complaint

3/16/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/16/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/16/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/16/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

3/27/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

3/27/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

4/16/2020: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Proof of Personal Service

4/21/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Related Case

4/16/2020: Notice of Related Case

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: DEFENDANT DELTA AIRLINES, INC...)

5/28/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: DEFENDANT DELTA AIRLINES, INC...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: DEFENDANT DELTA AIRLINES, INC...) OF 05/28/2020

5/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: DEFENDANT DELTA AIRLINES, INC...) OF 05/28/2020

Notice - NOTICE OF FILING A NOTICE OF REMOVAL

5/21/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF FILING A NOTICE OF REMOVAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: STATUS OF DEFENDANT'S REMOVAL...)

8/18/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: STATUS OF DEFENDANT'S REMOVAL...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: STATUS OF DEFENDANT'S REMOVAL...) OF 08/18/2020

8/18/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: STATUS OF DEFENDANT'S REMOVAL...) OF 08/18/2020

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (Re Status of Defendant's Removal of State Action to Federal Court) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Status of Defendant's Removal...) of 08/18/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Status of Defendant's Removal...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • Docketat 10:57 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Defendant Delta Airlines, Inc...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Defendant Delta Airlines, Inc...) of 05/28/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketDELTA AIR LINES, INC.'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT; Filed by DELTA Airlines, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jacqueline M. Thomas Pait (Plaintiff); Anson Bevans (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketStatement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by Jacqueline M. Thomas Pait (Plaintiff); Anson Bevans (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Jacqueline M. Thomas Pait (Plaintiff); Anson Bevans (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jacqueline M. Thomas Pait (Plaintiff); Anson Bevans (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jacqueline M. Thomas Pait (Plaintiff); Anson Bevans (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jacqueline M. Thomas Pait (Plaintiff); Anson Bevans (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Delta Air Lines Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEWIS AUTUMN ELIZABETH